This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:34:30 (UTC).

SUE KAPLAN ET AL VS. CALIFORNIA COASTAL COMMISSION ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/11/2017 SUE KAPLAN filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CALIFORNIA COASTAL COMMISSION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARY H. STROBEL, TORRIBIO, JOHN A., DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB and JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0771

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARY H. STROBEL

TORRIBIO, JOHN A.

DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

KAPLAN SUE

RUDISILL ROBIN

MUELLER INGRID

NAVARRO CARMEN R.

ROBIN RUDISILL

CARMEN R. NAVARRO

SUE KAPLAN

INGRID MUELLER

Defendants and Respondents

CALIFORNIA COASTAL COMMISSION

DOES 1 TO 20

LOS ANGELES CTIY OF

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Interested Parties

ROES 1 TO 20

LISA HENSON REVOCABLE TRUST

LISA HENSON TRUSTEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEWARD AMANDA MARIE

Respondent Attorneys

ROSENFELD JENNIFER WILCOXEN

ASLANIAN LEONARD PERRY

Interested Party Attorney

COHEN ALBERT MARTIN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/29/2019: Request for Dismissal

FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

1/5/2018: FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

1/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Service

1/16/2018: Proof of Service

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

2/14/2018: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

Minute Order

3/1/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

3/13/2018: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/27/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

4/13/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/21/2018: Minute Order

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

6/25/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

6/25/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Minute Order

6/27/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/28/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/5/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

7/6/2018: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

7/6/2018: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

7/6/2018: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CARMEN R. NAVARRO (Petitioner); INGRID MUELLER (Petitioner); ROBIN RUDISILL (Petitioner) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CALIFORNIA COASTAL COMMISSION (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LISA HENSON REVOCABLE TRUST (Real Party in Interest); LISA HENSON, TRUSTEE (Real Party in Interest)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by LISA HENSON, TRUSTEE (Real Party in Interest)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketJoinder (to Trial Setting Conference Statement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketNotice (of Telephonic Appearance)

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2017
  • Docketat 3:30 PM in Department 82; Court Order (Court Order; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-09-15 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketVERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketPetition-Writ-Mandate; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketPetition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COHEN ALBERT M. ESQ.