This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2023 at 09:07:26 (UTC).

SUE CUTLER VS CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/03/2022 SUE CUTLER filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1158

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

CUTLER SUE

Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

CITY OF MANHATTAN BEACH

DOES 1 THROUGH 45

KANSAL KARI

KANSAL NIKHIL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON

CUTLER SUE

ROES 1 THROUGH 30 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS RICHARD F.G.

Defendant Attorneys

YEGAZARIAN NONA

WALSHOK COLIN HOWARD

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

TOURKOW GEORGE DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Cross-Complaint

7/13/2023: Cross-Complaint

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/7/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

4/3/2023: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 03/22/2023

3/22/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 03/22/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/22/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

3/13/2023: Answer

Case Management Statement

3/7/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/6/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/6/2023: Case Management Statement

Answer

3/6/2023: Answer

Case Management Statement

3/2/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

2/22/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/22/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/22/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/14/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

2/14/2023: Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Answer

2/14/2023: Answer

Cross-Complaint

2/14/2023: Cross-Complaint

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2024
  • Hearing04/08/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2024
  • Hearing03/29/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2023
  • Hearing12/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Nikhil Kansal (Defendant); Kari Kansal (Defendant); As to: Sue Cutler (Plaintiff); City of Manhattan Beach (Defendant); Southern California Edison (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order Stipulation and Proposed Order to File Cross-Complaint; Signed and Filed by: Nikhil Kansal (Defendant); Kari Kansal (Defendant); As to: Sue Cutler (Plaintiff); City of Manhattan Beach (Defendant); Southern California Edison (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and Proposed Order to File Cross-Complaint: Filed By: Kari Kansal (Defendant),Nikhil Kansal (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 07/07/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Joinder to Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication scheduled for 10/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 12/07/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Kari Kansal (Cross-Defendant); Nikhil Kansal (Cross-Defendant); As to: City of Manhattan Beach (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 12/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/29/2024 at 09:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: City of Manhattan Beach (Defendant); As to: Southern California Edison (Defendant); Nikhil Kansal (Defendant); Kari Kansal (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: City of Manhattan Beach (Defendant); As to: Sue Cutler (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: City of Manhattan Beach (Defendant); As to: Southern California Edison (Defendant); Nikhil Kansal (Defendant); Kari Kansal (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sue Cutler (Plaintiff); As to: City of Manhattan Beach (Defendant); Southern California Edison (Defendant); Nikhil Kansal (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sue Cutler (Plaintiff); As to: City of Manhattan Beach (Defendant); Southern California Edison (Defendant); Nikhil Kansal (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sue Cutler (Plaintiff); As to: City of Manhattan Beach (Defendant); Southern California Edison (Defendant); Nikhil Kansal (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less