Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 11:04:31 (UTC).

SUE ANN JOHNSON VS YELLOW CAB OF SOUTH BAY CO-OPERATIVE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 SUE ANN JOHNSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against YELLOW CAB OF SOUTH BAY CO-OPERATIVE, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3032

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON SUE ANN

Defendants

REYES DAVID

YELLOW CAB OF SOUTH BAY CO-OPERATIVE INC. DBA SOUTH BAY YELLOW CAB

L.A. TAXI COOPERATIVE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CUTTING STACEY RAE

Defendant Attorney

CARROLL KYLE P.

 

Court Documents

Answer

7/8/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

4/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

4/27/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

4/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/6/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2024
  • Hearing04/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • Hearing10/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • Hearing09/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Yellow Cab of South Bay Co-Operative, Inc. (Defendant); L.A. Taxi Cooperative, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sue Ann Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sue Ann Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sue Ann Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sue Ann Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sue Ann Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sue Ann Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YELLOW CAB OF SOUTH BAY CO-OPERATIVE INC. DBA UNITED CHECKER CAB A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where L.A. TAXI COOPERATIVE INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CUTTING STACEY RAE