This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2021 at 03:21:17 (UTC).

SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST, ELISA RISTER, ET AL. VS CASA COLINA HOSPITAL AND CENTERS FOR HEALTHCARE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST, ELISA RISTER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CASA COLINA HOSPITAL AND CENTERS FOR HEALTHCARE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2114

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RISTER ELISA

ROSENZWEIG JEFFREY

ROSENZWEIG MICHAEL

ROSENZWEIG MYRA

SCHMIDT HELENE

SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST ELISA RISTER

Defendants

CASA COLINA HOSPITAL AND CENTERS FOR HEALTHCARE DBA CASA COLINA HOSPITAL

GHC OF ULAND SNF LLC DBA HERITAGE PARK NURSING CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PECK SPENCER ELIOT

Defendant Attorney

MEIER KARLA MYKELL

 

Court Documents

Answer

9/13/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/13/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

9/13/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

Case Management Statement

9/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/31/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/31/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Mail

7/23/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 377.32

6/14/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 377.32

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/14/2021: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • Hearing09/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Of Trial Attorney); Filed by Casa Colina Hospital and Centers for Healthcare (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by successor-in-interest, Elisa Rister (Plaintiff); Elisa Rister (Plaintiff); Michael Rosenzweig (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by successor-in-interest, Elisa Rister (Plaintiff); Elisa Rister (Plaintiff); Michael Rosenzweig (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by successor-in-interest, Elisa Rister (Plaintiff); Elisa Rister (Plaintiff); Michael Rosenzweig (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by successor-in-interest, Elisa Rister (Plaintiff); Elisa Rister (Plaintiff); Michael Rosenzweig (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by successor-in-interest, Elisa Rister (Plaintiff); Elisa Rister (Plaintiff); Michael Rosenzweig (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 377.32); Filed by successor-in-interest, Elisa Rister (Plaintiff); Elisa Rister (Plaintiff); Michael Rosenzweig (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by successor-in-interest, Elisa Rister (Plaintiff); Elisa Rister (Plaintiff); Michael Rosenzweig (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CASA COLINA HOSPITAL AND CENTERS FOR HEALTHCARE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PECK SPENCER ELIOT