This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2021 at 06:04:03 (UTC).

STUDIO 35K PRODUCTIONS, INC. VS BILL HUDSON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 STUDIO 35K PRODUCTIONS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BILL HUDSON,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK V. MOONEY and ZAVEN V. SINANIAN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5244

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK V. MOONEY

ZAVEN V. SINANIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STUDIO 35K PRODUCTIONS INC.

Defendants

HUDSON BILL

THE TRUMAN VAN DYKE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KERNAN STEPHEN MICHAEL

KATRINAK RAYMOND PAUL

Defendant Attorneys

HERME LISA

KLIER-ERLICH RINAT

GOMEZ CHARLES G.

 

Court Documents

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE CESAR RODRIGHEZ 13269

4/9/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE CESAR RODRIGHEZ 13269

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

4/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

Association of Attorney

4/9/2021: Association of Attorney

Notice of Ruling

4/9/2021: Notice of Ruling

Objection - OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RULING RE MULTIPLE DISCOVERY MOTIONS

4/27/2021: Objection - OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RULING RE MULTIPLE DISCOVERY MOTIONS

Request for Judicial Notice

5/4/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Status Report

5/4/2021: Status Report

Order - ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

5/4/2021: Order - ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

Status Report

5/4/2021: Status Report

Declaration - DECLARATION OF S. MICHAEL KERNAN RE JOINT REPORT

5/4/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF S. MICHAEL KERNAN RE JOINT REPORT

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME

5/5/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS BILL HUDSON AND TRUMAN VAN DYKE COMPANY FOR ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; MEMORANDUM OF PO

5/5/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANTS BILL HUDSON AND TRUMAN VAN DYKE COMPANY FOR ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER; MEMORANDUM OF PO

Motion for Protective Order

5/5/2021: Motion for Protective Order

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CHARLES G. GOMEZ IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON DEFENANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

5/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CHARLES G. GOMEZ IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON DEFENANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

Order - ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER ON REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION

5/6/2021: Order - ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER ON REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION

Order - ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

5/6/2021: Order - ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE DEBORAH MORIN

5/6/2021: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE DEBORAH MORIN

Substitution of Attorney

5/6/2021: Substitution of Attorney

120 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Disqualify Counsel - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend (Second Amended Answer) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department STL-E, Zaven V. Sinanian, Presiding; MSC Timeslot (Judge Zaven V. Sinanian)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend (Complaint) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
169 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer (Amended answer); Filed by Bill Hudson (Defendant); The Truman Van Dyke Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Bill Hudson (Defendant); The Truman Van Dyke Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Studio 35k Productions, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE TRUMAN VAN DYKE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOMEZ CHARLES GAITAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLIER-ERLICH RINAT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERME LISA