This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/21/2021 at 08:49:10 (UTC).

STUDENT LOAN SOLUTIONS, LLC, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS NANCY PEUGH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 STUDENT LOAN SOLUTIONS, LLC, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NANCY PEUGH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0125

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STUDENT LOAN SOLUTIONS LLC SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

Defendants

PEUGH LAUREN

PEUGH NANCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOOSKA STEVEN A.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/18/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Mail

3/18/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/17/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/17/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/17/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by STUDENT LOAN SOLUTIONS, LLC, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by STUDENT LOAN SOLUTIONS, LLC, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by STUDENT LOAN SOLUTIONS, LLC, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by STUDENT LOAN SOLUTIONS, LLC, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by STUDENT LOAN SOLUTIONS, LLC, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STUDENT LOAN SOLUTIONS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven A Booska