This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2021 at 02:27:57 (UTC).

STUART SCOVIL ROBERTS VS JEAN EGAN

Case Summary

On 01/11/2018 STUART SCOVIL ROBERTS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JEAN EGAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PATRICIA D. NIETO, GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0040

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PATRICIA D. NIETO

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ROBERTS STURART SCOVIL

Defendants and Respondents

EGAN JEAN

DOES 1 TO 50

THE GENE M. EGAN FAMILY TRUST

THE ESTATE OF JEAN EGAN DOE 1

JEAN M. EGAN FAMILY TRUST

THE JEAN M. EGAN FAMILY TRUST DOE 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SAADIAN BOBBY ESQ.

SAADIAN BABAK BOBBY ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FREEMAN MATHIS & GARY LLP

BIGLEY PAUL ANDREW ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

9/3/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL AS COUNSEL FOR PL...)

12/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL AS COUNSEL FOR PL...)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/28/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

1/11/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RESPONSE BY DEFENDANT(S) OR ENTRY OF ...)

1/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RESPONSE BY DEFENDANT(S) OR ENTRY OF ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RESPONSE BY DEFENDANT(S) OR ENTRY OF ...)

6/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RESPONSE BY DEFENDANT(S) OR ENTRY OF ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

3/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 03/23/2020

3/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 03/23/2020

Proof of Personal Service

1/15/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/15/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/26/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/27/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

9/9/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

9/26/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLANT ON BEHALF OF JEAN EGAN

3/2/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLANT ON BEHALF OF JEAN EGAN

SUMMONS -

1/11/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE 2.NEGLIGENCE PER SE

1/11/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE 2.NEGLIGENCE PER SE

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • Hearing02/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Hearing01/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Response by Defendant(s) or Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Sturart Scovil Roberts (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Sturart Scovil Roberts (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Sturart Scovil Roberts (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (as Counsel for Plaintiff Stuart Roberts, Filed by Attorney Jonathan C. Teller/Wilshire Law Firm) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel as Counsel for Pl...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Sturart Scovil Roberts (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Babak Bobby Saadian, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-06-11 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TO ATTEND DEPOSITION AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Filed by Sturart Scovil Roberts (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLANT ON BEHALF OF JEAN EGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jean Egan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Sturart Scovil Roberts (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sturart Scovil Roberts (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE 2.NEGLIGENCE PER SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC690040    Hearing Date: December 21, 2020    Dept: 29

The unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Stuart Roberts, is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. Counsel declares that the motion was personally served on the client, however, there is no indication that personal service was accomplished.

Assuming counsel provides proof of personal service on Plaintiff at the time of the hearing, the motion will be GRANTED. Counsel has otherwise complied with California Rules of Court 3.1362. The order is effective upon the filing of the proof of service of the motion on the Plaintiff. Until then, counsel remains counsel of record.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.