This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/28/2020 at 13:15:54 (UTC).

STRUCK, TAMARA VS STRUCK, JERRY

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 STRUCK, TAMARA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against STRUCK, JERRY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0694

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STRUCK TAMARA

Respondent

STRUCK JERRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KIRIAKIDIS LISA ELAINE

Respondent Attorney

STRUCK JAMES DALE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - (Electronic Service)

8/31/2020: Proof of Service - (Electronic Service)

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

8/31/2020: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Proof of Service - Mail - by electronic service

6/23/2020: Proof of Service - Mail - by electronic service

Miscellaneous - consent to electronic service and notice of electronic service address

6/23/2020: Miscellaneous - consent to electronic service and notice of electronic service address

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

6/23/2020: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Miscellaneous - consent to electronic service and notice of electronic service address

6/26/2020: Miscellaneous - consent to electronic service and notice of electronic service address

Proof of Service of Summons

6/8/2020: Proof of Service of Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

5/20/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

5/20/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

5/20/2020: Summons

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

5/20/2020: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

5/20/2020: Notice - Case Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketProof of Service ((Electronic Service) ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous (consent to electronic service and notice of electronic service address ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (by electronic service ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous (consent to electronic service and notice of electronic service address ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Struck, James D.