This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/22/2020 at 15:46:17 (UTC).

STROLL, JONATHAN VS GASIO, MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 STROLL, JONATHAN filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against GASIO, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PUENTE-PORRAS, MARIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1658

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PUENTE-PORRAS, MARIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STROLL JONATHAN

Respondent

GASIO MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

HURWITZ BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

12/16/2020: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

12/16/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Substitution of Attorney

12/16/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

12/16/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

12/16/2020: Minute Order

Proof of Service

12/7/2020: Proof of Service

Proof of Service - CH-100, CH-109, CH-110

12/7/2020: Proof of Service - CH-100, CH-109, CH-110

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

11/25/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Addendum

11/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Addendum

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

11/25/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

11/25/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - Civil Harassment

11/25/2020: Petition - Civil Harassment

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • Hearing02/23/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department S15 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S15, Puente-Porras, Maria, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (CH-100, CH-109, CH-110 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (Addendum )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less