Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/24/2020 at 02:35:12 (UTC).

STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC. VS ERG HOME HEALTH PROVIDER

Case Summary

On 07/20/2018 STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ERG HOME HEALTH PROVIDER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RALPH C. HOFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8856

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RALPH C. HOFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE INC.

Defendants

BELZUNCE MARIA ISABEL

ERG HOME HEALTH PROVIDER INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VILLALBA ORLANDO J.

VILLALBA ORLANDO JOSE

GIBBS LAUREN MARIE

LEVIN PAUL ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH REQUEST TO RETAIN JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6

7/5/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH REQUEST TO RETAIN JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT ORD...)

7/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT ORD...)

Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

4/16/2019: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: DISMISSAL IN LIGHT OF SETTLEMENT)

4/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RE: DISMISSAL IN LIGHT OF SETTLEMENT)

Status Report

4/9/2019: Status Report

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Case Management Conference Notice of Settlement-Conditional f...) of 02/15/2019

2/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Case Management Conference Notice of Settlement-Conditional f...) of 02/15/2019

Summons

7/20/2018: Summons

Case Management Statement

12/5/2018: Case Management Statement

Notice of Ruling

12/17/2018: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

12/17/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/20/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/20/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice - Notice Of Order to Show Cause Re Failure to Comply with Trial Court Delay Reduction Act

7/20/2018: Notice - Notice Of Order to Show Cause Re Failure to Comply with Trial Court Delay Reduction Act

Notice of Settlement -

10/10/2018: Notice of Settlement -

Civil Case Cover Sheet -

7/20/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet -

Notice of Case Assignment -

7/20/2018: Notice of Case Assignment -

Notice of OSC -

7/20/2018: Notice of OSC -

Complaint -

7/20/2018: Complaint -

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (reDismissal in Light of Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (reDismissal in Light of Settlement) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Non-Appearance Case Review (NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER CONTINUING CASE SET ON A ?DARK? DATE;) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice With Request to Retain Jurisdiction Pursuant to CCP 664.6); Filed by STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT ORD...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT ORD...) of 07/05/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (reDismissal in Light of Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re: Dismissal in Light of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of OSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketNotice (Of Order to Show Cause Re Failure to Comply with Trial Court Delay Reduction Act)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STRATEGIC FUNDING SOURCE INC. DBA SODA SODA DISTRIBUTING A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ERG HOME HEALTH PROVIDER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIBBS LAUREN MARIE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Villalba, Orlando Jose