This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2021 at 01:27:40 (UTC).

STP CAPITAL LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS SAMEER MALHOTRA, M.D., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/24/2020 STP CAPITAL LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against SAMEER MALHOTRA, M D . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2363

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Cross Defendants

STP CAPITAL LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

FARHANG FARZAD

PENDERY SCOTT

Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

BATRA M.D. R. SONIA

MALHOTRA M.D. SAMEER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MEYER NATHAN

Respondent and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HARRIS MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE PETITIONERS NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION AND SATISFACTION OF ARBITRATION AWARD

3/18/2021: Notice - NOTICE PETITIONERS NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION AND SATISFACTION OF ARBITRATION AWARD

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)

6/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

9/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, APPOINTING ARBITRATOR, STAYING CASE AND SETTING ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE

9/21/2020: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, APPOINTING ARBITRATOR, STAYING CASE AND SETTING ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

9/14/2020: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Motion to Compel Arbitration - MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (AMENDED)

8/27/2020: Motion to Compel Arbitration - MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (AMENDED)

Notice - NOTICE ERRATA TO RESPONDENTS' POINTS & AUTHORITIES

8/25/2020: Notice - NOTICE ERRATA TO RESPONDENTS' POINTS & AUTHORITIES

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

8/19/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

Answer

8/19/2020: Answer

Opposition - OPPOSITION RESPONDENTS' POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO NOTICE TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

8/19/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION RESPONDENTS' POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO NOTICE TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Cross-Complaint

8/19/2020: Cross-Complaint

Motion to Compel Arbitration

8/10/2020: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/5/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/27/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition - PETITION PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

7/24/2020: Petition - PETITION PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

7/24/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Status Conference (reArbitration) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference re: Arbitration)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice (PETITIONER?S NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION AND SATISFACTION OF ARBITRATION AWARD); Filed by STP Capital LLC, a limited liability company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (Granting Motion To Compel Arbitration, Appointing Arbitrator, Staying Case And Setting Arbitration Status Conference); Filed by STP Capital LLC, a limited liability company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketReply (in support of Motion to Compel Arbitration); Filed by STP Capital LLC, a limited liability company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration ((AMENDED)); Filed by STP Capital LLC, a limited liability company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Errata to Respondents' Points & Authorities); Filed by Sameer Malhotra, M.D. (Cross-Complainant); R. Sonia Batra M.D. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sameer Malhotra, M.D. (Respondent); R. Sonia Batra M.D. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Sameer Malhotra, M.D. (Respondent); R. Sonia Batra M.D. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by Sameer Malhotra, M.D. (Respondent); R. Sonia Batra M.D. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by STP Capital LLC, a limited liability company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by STP Capital LLC, a limited liability company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by STP Capital LLC, a limited liability company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by STP Capital LLC, a limited liability company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketPetition (Petition to Compel Arbitration); Filed by STP Capital LLC, a limited liability company (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEYER NATHAN