This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/26/2021 at 05:26:18 (UTC).

STOKKE, JOHN M. VS STOKKE, MEGAN E.

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 STOKKE, JOHN M filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against STOKKE, MEGAN E. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0048

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STOKKE JOHN M.

Respondent

STOKKE MEGAN E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MONARCH DANNY PETER

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Mail

2/18/2021: Proof of Service - Mail

FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

2/11/2021: FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

2/11/2021: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

2/11/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation

2/11/2021: RFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/15/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

1/15/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Declaration - UCCJEA

1/15/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Summons

1/15/2021: Summons

Notice - Case Assignment

1/15/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

1/15/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • Hearing03/24/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department J at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Request for Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Custody, Visitation; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketOrder - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less