Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 08:41:14 (UTC).

STOCKTON CONGREGATIONAL HOMES, ET AL. VS CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEAL TH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/19/2019 STOCKTON CONGREGATIONAL HOMES filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEAL TH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2523

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Petitioners

HOLIDAY MANOR CARE CENTER

AG LA MESA LLC

VILLA MESA CARE CENTER

CF MODESTO LLC

RIVERSIDE SANITARIUM LLC

STOCKTON CONGREGATIONAL HOMES

AG SEAL BEACH LLC

KF SUNRAY LLC

CF MADERA LLC

LEISURE GLEN POST ACUTE CARE CENTER

UNITED CONVALESCENT FACILITIES INC.

MESA GLEN CARE CENTER

LAKE MERRITT HEALTH CARE CENTER

KF COMMUNITY CARE LLC

AG ARCADIA LLC

13400 SHERMAN WAY LLC

3067 ORANGE AVE LLC

SIMI VALLEY HEALTHCARE CENTER

BVCV OPERATING COMPANY LLC

Respondent

SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION

43 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

BADAWIYA RIMA M.

COLLINS CLAIRE HERVEY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Status Conference and Order

7/3/2019: Notice of Status Conference and Order

Notice of Related Case

7/3/2019: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order

7/25/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

6/24/2019: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

Request for Dismissal

6/24/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Related Case

6/26/2019: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order

6/28/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

6/28/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Declaration

6/21/2019: Declaration

Response

6/21/2019: Response

Summons

6/19/2019: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/19/2019: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Status Conference (ReRelated Cases with 19STCP02565) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Related Cases with 19STCP02565)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case ((Amended)); Filed by UNITED CONVALESCENT FACILITIES, INC. (Petitioner); STOCKTON CONGREGATIONAL HOMES (Petitioner); BIXBY KNOLLS TOWERS, INC. (Petitioner) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Docketat 11:25 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (COURT ORDER) of 06/28/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (COURT ORDER)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by UNITED CONVALESCENT FACILITIES, INC. (Petitioner); STOCKTON CONGREGATIONAL HOMES (Petitioner); BIXBY KNOLLS TOWERS, INC. (Petitioner) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by STOCKTON CONGREGATIONAL HOMES (Petitioner); BIXBY KNOLLS TOWERS, INC. (Petitioner); CATHEDRAL PIONEER CHURCH HOMES NO. TWO (Petitioner) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by UNITED CONVALESCENT FACILITIES, INC. (Petitioner); STOCKTON CONGREGATIONAL HOMES (Petitioner); BIXBY KNOLLS TOWERS, INC. (Petitioner) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (OF CHELSEA DRISCOLL IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH'S RESPONSE TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER); Filed by CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEAL TH (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketResponse (TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER); Filed by CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEAL TH (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by UNITED CONVALESCENT FACILITIES, INC. (Petitioner); STOCKTON CONGREGATIONAL HOMES (Petitioner); BIXBY KNOLLS TOWERS, INC. (Petitioner) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by UNITED CONVALESCENT FACILITIES, INC. (Petitioner); STOCKTON CONGREGATIONAL HOMES (Petitioner); BIXBY KNOLLS TOWERS, INC. (Petitioner) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by UNITED CONVALESCENT FACILITIES, INC. (Petitioner); STOCKTON CONGREGATIONAL HOMES (Petitioner); BIXBY KNOLLS TOWERS, INC. (Petitioner) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOLIDAY MANOR CARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where MESA GLEN CARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where BVCV OPERATING CO. LLC DBA MONTE VISTA HEALTHCARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where AG LA MESA LLC is a litigant