This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/01/2023 at 00:40:35 (UTC).

STEVI S HALL, AN INDIVIDUAL VS ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/15/2022 STEVI S HALL, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0803

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HALL AN INDIVIDUAL STEVI S

Defendants

ALBERTSONS COMPANIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

SAFEWAY INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

THE VONS COMPANIES INC. A MICHIGAN CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRISMER MARC

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/15/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/15/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/17/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/17/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • Hearing04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S27 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • Hearing01/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S27 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark C. Kim in Department S27 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Stevi S Hall, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Albertsons Companies, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); The Vons Companies, Inc., a Michigan Corporation (Defendant); Safeway Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Stevi S Hall, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Albertsons Companies, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); The Vons Companies, Inc., a Michigan Corporation (Defendant); Safeway Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Stevi S Hall, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Albertsons Companies, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); The Vons Companies, Inc., a Michigan Corporation (Defendant); Safeway Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE VONS COMPANIES INC DBA PAVILIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where Safeway Inc, a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Albertsons Companies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRISMER MARC