Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/05/2019 at 02:48:17 (UTC).

STEVENS GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC VS US DIRECT, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 STEVENS GLOBAL LOGISTICS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against US DIRECT, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1948

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEVENS GLOBAL LOGISTICS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

US DIRECT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY CORPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOYDSTON BRIAN DONALD

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/7/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/7/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY

8/6/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/24/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTICE CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION

4/5/2019: Notice - NOTICE CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/5/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

4/5/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • Hearing01/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Hearing01/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Status Conference (re bankruptcy) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketNotice ( of Bankruptcy); Filed by Stevens Global Logistics, Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Stevens Global Logistics, Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Stevens Global Logistics, Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Stevens Global Logistics, Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketNotice (Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum and Statement of Location); Filed by Stevens Global Logistics, Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STEVENS GLOBAL LOGISTICS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOYDSTON BRIAN DONALD