This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2022 at 10:52:46 (UTC).

STEVEN WHITE VS SPECTRUM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 STEVEN WHITE filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against SPECTRUM,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1262

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHITE STEVEN

Defendants

CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS

RUTLEDGE THOMAS

SPECTRUM

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/26/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/26/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/26/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/26/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/26/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/26/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/26/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/26/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2024
  • Hearing09/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2024
  • Hearing03/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2024
  • Hearing03/11/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Steven White (Plaintiff); As to: Spectrum (Defendant); Thomas Rutledge (Defendant); Charter Communications (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/11/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Steven White (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Steven White (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Steven White (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPECTRUM is a litigant

Latest cases where Charter Communications Inc. is a litigant