This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2023 at 10:20:42 (UTC).

STEVEN TRINH, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 STEVEN TRINH, AN INDIVIDUAL, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0392

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TRINH AN INDIVIDUAL LINDA

TRINH AN INDIVIDUAL STEVEN

Defendants

CALSTAR MOTORS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DAIMLER TRUST A BUSINESS TRUST ORGANIZED AND EXISTING UNDER THE LAWS OF THE STATE OF DELAWARE

LITHIA MOTORS INC. AN OREGON CORPORATION DBA MERCEDES-BENZ OF LOS ANGELES

MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICS USA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARNELL ESQ. STEPHEN

Defendant Attorneys

VANLOCHEM M.

TAHSILDOOST ESQ. SOHEYL

MCGREEVY ESQ. RICHARD E.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

8/18/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FILING OF...)

8/17/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FILING OF...)

Case Management Statement

8/7/2023: Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorney

7/13/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

7/13/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

6/30/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION TO DEFENDANT MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION

5/24/2023: Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION TO DEFENDANT MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/15/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

5/5/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/4/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

4/26/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/21/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/19/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/19/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

3/17/2023: Answer

Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION TO DEFENDANT MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION

3/15/2023: Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION TO DEFENDANT MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION

Motion to Compel Arbitration

3/2/2023: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Request for Judicial Notice

3/2/2023: Request for Judicial Notice

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2024
  • Hearing01/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: completion of arbitration of issue of arbitrability

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2024
  • Hearing01/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Steven Trinh, an individual (Plaintiff); Linda Trinh, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: completion of arbitration of issue of arbitrability scheduled for 01/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: filing of...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 01/16/2024 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: filing of Answer scheduled for 08/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 08/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Steven Trinh, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 09/06/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 08/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration [Binding] filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC on 03-02-2023; Joinder to Motion to Compel Binding Arbitration; scheduled for 08/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 08/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stephen Parnell, Esq. (Attorney): Last Name changed from Parnell to Parnell, Esq. Organization Name changed from Law Offices of Adam Zolonz, APC to Law Offices of Adam Zolonz, A.P.C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketAddress for Stephen Parnell, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Steven Trinh, an individual (Plaintiff); Linda Trinh, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Calstar Motors Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Mercedes-Benz Financial Servics USA LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketAffidavit Affidavit of Venue; Filed by: Steven Trinh, an individual (Plaintiff); Linda Trinh, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Calstar Motors Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Mercedes-Benz Financial Servics USA LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Steven Trinh, an individual (Plaintiff); Linda Trinh, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Calstar Motors Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Mercedes-Benz Financial Servics USA LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Steven Trinh, an individual (Plaintiff); Linda Trinh, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Calstar Motors Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Mercedes-Benz Financial Servics USA LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less