This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/14/2023 at 08:40:09 (UTC).

STEVEN TORICES VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 STEVEN TORICES filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2114

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TORICES STEVEN

Defendant

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOOD CAREY B.

Defendant Attorney

MACLEAR AMY PATRICIA

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/22/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/22/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/22/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

12/6/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/9/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

12/29/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • Hearing05/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Ford Motor Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketNotice Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Steven Torices (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Steven Torices (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company (Defendant); Service Date: 11/29/2022; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Steven Torices (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Steven Torices (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Steven Torices (Plaintiff); As to: Ford Motor Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Valerie Salkin in Department U Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less