This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/12/2022 at 12:00:11 (UTC).

STEVEN PARRIS VS MASTRO'S RESTAURANTS, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/16/2021 STEVEN PARRIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MASTRO'S RESTAURANTS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0169

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARRIS STEVEN

Defendants

MASTRO'S RESTAURANTS LLC

ESPY MATTHEW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOOFER RAMIN

Defendant Attorney

BENSON CONNIE LYNN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/16/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

8/24/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/24/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

8/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

9/22/2021: Answer

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/20/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

9/20/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

9/10/2021: PI General Order

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2024
  • Hearing08/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • Hearing02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • Hearing01/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by MASTRO'S RESTAURANTS, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by STEVEN PARRIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by MASTRO'S RESTAURANTS, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by STEVEN PARRIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by STEVEN PARRIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by STEVEN PARRIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by STEVEN PARRIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by STEVEN PARRIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by STEVEN PARRIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by STEVEN PARRIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by STEVEN PARRIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MASTRO'S RESTAURANTS LLC is a litigant