This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/23/2020 at 08:01:14 (UTC).

STEVEN NIA VS U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/24/2018 STEVEN NIA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7294

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants and Appellants

NIA STEVEN

MAGNUM PROPERTY INVESTMENTS LLC

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

FCI LENDER SERVICES INC.

DOES 1 TO 100

BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER & WEISS

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL

RECONTRUST COMPANY N.A.

MCMAHAN RON

AMIP MANAGEMENT LLC

U. S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

CHABAD OF LAKE ENCINO INC.

Plaintiffs, Defendants and Respondents

MAGNUM PROPERTY INVESTMENTS LLC

FCI LENDER SERVICES INC.

MCMAHAN RON

AMIP MANAGEMENT LLC

U. S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

KERENDIAN RAMIN JOSEPH

Attorney at Law Office of R. Joseph Kerendian, APC

11400 W Olympic Blvd #700

Los Angeles, CA 90064

LANDAU LEWIS

NUSSBAUM LANE MICHAEL

COHEN HARRIS LINDLEY

Attorney at Harris L. Cohen, A Professional Corp.

5305 Andasol Ave

Encino, CA 91316

FINLAY THOMAS ROBERT

Attorney at Wright Finlay & Zak LLP

4665 Macarthur Ct Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

GHIDOTTI MICHELLE RENE

Attorney at The Law Offices of Michelle Ghidotti

1920 Old Tustin Ave

Santa Ana, CA 92705

BURNS ELKANAH JOHNSON JR

COHEN EARLE H.

NUSSBAUM LANE M.

GHIDOTTI MICHELLE R.

 

Court Documents

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO LIFT STAY

10/16/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO LIFT STAY

Response - RESPONSE SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSING STAY TERMINATION UNDER SUPREME COURT'S VARIAN DECISION

12/2/2019: Response - RESPONSE SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSING STAY TERMINATION UNDER SUPREME COURT'S VARIAN DECISION

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

5/3/2019: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

4/26/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

Reply - REPLY REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/4/2019: Reply - REPLY REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

4/8/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING SUSTAINING DEMURRERS

4/10/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING SUSTAINING DEMURRERS

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE TO PLAINTIFF'S PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/27/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE TO PLAINTIFF'S PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

6/14/2018: Summons

Minute Order

9/5/2018: Minute Order

Amended Complaint

2/1/2019: Amended Complaint

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

1/11/2019: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Opposition -

9/14/2018: Opposition -

Case Management Statement -

9/10/2018: Case Management Statement -

Case Management Statement -

9/11/2018: Case Management Statement -

Notice -

7/18/2018: Notice -

87 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (As to PROF-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust, by U.S. Bank National Association as Legal Title Trustee only. B297472); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (As to Magnum Property Investments, LLC only. B297472); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketAppellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: 05/03/19 B297472); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Status Conference (reAppeal) - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for an Order Lifting Stay) - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference re: Appeal; Hearing on Ex Parte Application...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/04/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketResponse (Supplemental Opposing Stay Termination Under Supreme Court's Varian Decision); Filed by Steven Nia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
138 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Magnum Property Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Chabad of Lake Encino, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Magnum Property Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Chabad of Lake Encino, Inc.)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Magnum Property Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Steven Nia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Steven Nia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Steven Nia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less