This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2021 at 03:53:47 (UTC).

STEVEN MACKEY VS 1100 WILSHIRE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/09/2019 STEVEN MACKEY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 1100 WILSHIRE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MALCOLM MACKEY and JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6266

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MALCOLM MACKEY

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MACKEY STEVEN

Defendant

1100 WILSHIRE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION A CALIFORNIA MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

IRMAS JARED M.

ECOFF LAWRENCE CRAIG

Defendant Attorneys

SIEGEL LEONARD

GARRELL PETER E.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/03/2021, A COPY OF L.A.S.C. MINUTE ORDER ISSUED THIS DATE IS ATTACHED TO THE CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/NOTICE.

3/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/03/2021, A COPY OF L.A.S.C. MINUTE ORDER ISSUED THIS DATE IS ATTACHED TO THE CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/NOTICE.

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL

3/11/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES

2/5/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES

Informal Discovery Conference

1/15/2020: Informal Discovery Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CON...) OF 07/14/2020

7/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CON...) OF 07/14/2020

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

7/15/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

7/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

9/25/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND DEFENDANT 1100 WILSHIRE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER

7/31/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND DEFENDANT 1100 WILSHIRE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER

Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF PETER E. GARRELL

8/2/2019: Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF PETER E. GARRELL

Request for Judicial Notice

8/8/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice of Ruling

8/19/2019: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/16/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE STEVEN MACKEY'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FURTHER CONTINUE THE ORDER TO SHOW CASE

7/16/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE STEVEN MACKEY'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FURTHER CONTINUE THE ORDER TO SHOW CASE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PETER E. GARRELL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF STEVEN MACKEY AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS; AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

6/25/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PETER E. GARRELL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF STEVEN MACKEY AND PRODUCE DOCUMENTS; AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT STIPULATION CONTINUING HEARING DATE FOR THE OSC RE: PRELIMINARY IN.JUNCTION FOR FOURTEEN DAYS AND COMMENSURATE CONTINUANCE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE

6/28/2019: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT STIPULATION CONTINUING HEARING DATE FOR THE OSC RE: PRELIMINARY IN.JUNCTION FOR FOURTEEN DAYS AND COMMENSURATE CONTINUANCE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE

Substitution of Attorney

6/3/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A 30-DAY CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND A

6/5/2019: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A 30-DAY CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND A

91 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • Hearing07/18/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • Hearing04/04/2022 at 11:30 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • Hearing03/25/2022 at 11:30 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING DATE OF DEFENDANT 1100 WILSHIRE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATIONS MOTION TO COMPEL (1) FURTHER ANSWERS FROM PLAINTIFF STEVEN MACKEY AT DEPOSITION; (2) PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL TO CEASE MAKING IMPROPER OBJECTIONS AND ACTING IN BAD FAITH); Filed by 1100 Wilshire Property Owners Association, a California mutual benefit corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 16; Jury Trial ((T/E5 days)) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 16; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of Final Status Conference and Trial); Filed by Steven Mackey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docketat 4:29 PM in Department 16; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/03/2021, A copy of L.A.S.C. Minute Order issued this date is attached to the Clerk's Certificate of Mailing/Notice.); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketOrder (Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order); Filed by Steven Mackey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff Ex Parte Application for Issuance of Tem...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of JMC in SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT 1100 WILSHIRE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE); Filed by 1100 Wilshire Property Owners Association, a California mutual benefit corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of ER in support of defendant 1100 Wilshire Property owners association's memorandum of points and authorities); Filed by 1100 Wilshire Property Owners Association, a California mutual benefit corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketOpposition (to Ex Parte); Filed by 1100 Wilshire Property Owners Association, a California mutual benefit corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketDeclaration ( of KP); Filed by 1100 Wilshire Property Owners Association, a California mutual benefit corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Steven Mackey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Steven Mackey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Steven Mackey (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 1100 WILSHIRE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIEGEL LEONARD

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARRELL PETER E. ESQ.