This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2019 at 02:17:47 (UTC).

STEVEN LOPEZ VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO INC

Case Summary

On 01/10/2018 STEVEN LOPEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9782

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ STEVEN

Defendant

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

ROMANO MARK P. ESQ.

ROMANO MARK PETER ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GARRETT & TULLY LAW OFFICES OF

TRAN TRANG THI

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

1/10/2018: SUMMONS

Minute Order

6/8/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE RE: COURT?S ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT

6/25/2018: NOTICE RE: COURT?S ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/23/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Request for Dismissal

7/10/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

5/22/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

5/22/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

5/1/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

5/1/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

5/3/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT, AND ORDER

5/7/2018: STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT, AND ORDER

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/8/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/23/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

4/11/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

CIVIL DEPOSIT

4/11/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

4/11/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

4/11/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

4/11/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Steven Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Steven Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketNOTICE RE: COURT S ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-06-08 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Docketat 08:46 AM in Department 28; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketAMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Steven Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Steven Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT 1. SONG-BEVERLY ACT 2. MAGNUSON-MOSS ACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

OWLN

ROMANO STANCROFF PC

Mark Romano, Esq. (SBN 244113) Timothy Whelan, Esq. (SBN 255037) 360 N. Sepulveda Blvd., Suite 1010 Super FCILtEflg o El Segundo, CA 90245 County of 1o Abiornia Telephone: (310) 477-7990 unty ofLos Angeles Fax: (310) 477-7995 . JAN 102018 Attorneys for Plaintiff, Sherri R. Cagter, Executixe Officer/Clerk STEVEN LOPEZ BLAQLm , Deputy Moses Soto :

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

STEVEN LOPEZ, CaseNo.. BC 6897 82 Plaintiff,

COMPLAINT

Vs. ' 1. SONG-BEVERLY ACT 2. MAGNUSON-MOSS ACT

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC,, a California Corporation, and DOES 1

through 10, inclusive, Assigned for All Purposes to the

Defendants. Honorable Department

Plaintiff, STEVEN LOPEZ, alleges as follows against Defendants, AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., and DOES 1 through 10 inclusive, on information and belief, formed after an inquiry reasonable under the circumstances:

GENERAL ALLEGATIONS

1. Plaintiff is an individual residing in the City of Torrance, County of Los Angeles, and

State of California.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant