This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 04:26:45 (UTC).

STEVEN J PEREZ VS SHEA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 01/26/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by STEVEN J PEREZ against SHEA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1878

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

PEREZ STEVEN J.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

SHEA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

6/13/2019: Substitution of Attorney

SUMMONS

1/26/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

1/26/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Steven J. Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Steven J. Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC691878    Hearing Date: February 21, 2020    Dept: NCD

TENTATIVE RULING

Calendar: 6

Date: 2/21/20

Case No: BC 691878 Trial Date: None Set

Case Name: Perez v. Shea Properties Management Company, Inc., et al.

DISCOVERY MOTION

(CCP § 2030.290, 2031.300, 2023.010 et seq)

Moving Party: Defendant Shea Properties Management Company, Inc.

Responding Party: Plaintiff Steven J. Perez (No Opposition)

RELIEF REQUESTED:

Responses to Form Interrogatories—General

Responses to Requests for Production of Documents and Things

MONETARY SANCTION

None sought

OPPOSITION:

No opposition. (Defendant has filed a Reply indicating no opposition has been timely served).

ANALYSIS:

Under CCP § 2030.290, “If a party to whom interrogatories are directed fails to serve a timely response,” that party “waives any legal right to exercise the option to produce writings...as well as any objection to the interrogatories, including one based on privilege or on the protection for work product...” Under subdivision (b), “The party propounding the interrogatories may move for an order compelling response to the interrogatories.” CCP §2031.300 contains similar provisions with respect to demands for inspection and copying of documents.

In this case, interrogatories and document production demands have been directed to plaintiff and plaintiff has failed to serve timely responses. Defendant has appropriately moved for an order to compel. Accordingly, plaintiff has waived the option to produce writings, as well as all objections. Plaintiff is ordered to respond.

RULING:

[No opposition]

Shea Properties Management Company, Inc.’s Motion to Compel Plaintiff Steven J. Perez’s Responses to Discovery is GRANTED.

Plaintiff Steven J. Perez is ordered to serve responses to Form Interrogatories—General, Set No. One, propounded by defendant Shea Properties Management, Inc., without objection, within ten days.

Plaintiff Steven J. Perez is ordered to serve responses to Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiff, Steven J. Perez (Set One), without objection, and to permit inspection and copying, within ten days.

Case Number: BC691878    Hearing Date: December 09, 2019    Dept: 2

AFTER REVIEW OF THE COURT FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 2 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above-entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in the North Central District, Glendale, JUDGE R. HOFER presiding in Department D for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.