This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2019 at 00:39:45 (UTC).

STEVEN J. HORN VS. ANTHONY M. KLING

Case Summary

On 09/18/2018 STEVEN J HORN filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against ANTHONY M KLING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SHIRLEY K. WATKINS and HUEY P. COTTON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0356

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

HUEY P. COTTON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HORN STEVEN J.

Encino, CA 91436-3095

Respondents

LINCOLN ONE CORPORATION A MISSOURI CORPORATION

3123 SMB LLC A MISSOURI LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

KLING ANTHONY M. AND HIS SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST

KLING MARY J. AND HER SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

HORN STEVEN JEFFRY

HORN VALERIE FAITH

BELAGA JONATHAN JEREMY

Respondent Attorney

KLING ANTHONY N

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/21/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/21/2019: Minute Order

Request

3/25/2019: Request

Exhibit List

3/25/2019: Exhibit List

Request for Judicial Notice

3/25/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice

3/25/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice

3/25/2019: Notice

Reply

3/25/2019: Reply

Reply

3/25/2019: Reply

Request

3/25/2019: Request

Exhibit List

3/25/2019: Exhibit List

Declaration

3/25/2019: Declaration

Declaration

3/25/2019: Declaration

Declaration

3/26/2019: Declaration

Declaration

3/26/2019: Declaration

Declaration

3/26/2019: Declaration

Reply

3/26/2019: Reply

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Hearing on Motion - Other (Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Hearing on Motion - Other (pursuant to CCP 583.250 bearing reservation no. 181115366358) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (bearing reservation no. 181112365069) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketRequest (TO STRIKE OPPOSITION BRIEF'S PAGES 1-6 [LASC Guidelines of Civility in Litigation, Appendix 3.A, Rule (C)(2)] & OPPOSITION REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF EXHIBITS 2-5, 8-10); Filed by Anthony M. Kling, and his Successors in Interest (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketDeclaration ( OF ALEX KANTER, ESQ, REG. AGENT FOR 3123 SMB LLC); Filed by Anthony M. Kling, and his Successors in Interest (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketDeclaration ( OF ALEX KANTER, ESQ, REG. AGENT FOR LINCOLN ONE CORPORATION); Filed by Anthony M. Kling, and his Successors in Interest (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Anthony M. Kling, and his Successors in Interest (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (REPLY DECLARATION OF ANTHONY KLING); Filed by Anthony M. Kling, and his Successors in Interest (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketOther - (Appendix of Exhibits 1); Filed by Anthony M. Kling, and his Successors in Interest (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketReply (DECLARATION OF MARY J KLING); Filed by Anthony M. Kling, and his Successors in Interest (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2018
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department T; Unknown Event Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketSummons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketSummons-Issued; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lincoln One Corporation is a litigant