Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2019 at 04:46:36 (UTC).

STEVEN HAWKINS ET AL VS PHILLIP CABASSO MD ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/19/2017 STEVEN HAWKINS filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against PHILLIP CABASSO MD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY J. FUJIE, GEORGINA T. RIZK and OWEN LEE KWONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8421

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY J. FUJIE

GEORGINA T. RIZK

OWEN LEE KWONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem

HAWKINS STEVEN

Defendants and Respondents

CHAWLA RAJESH M.D.

PHILLIP J. CABASSO MD A MEDICAL CORP

CABASSO PHILLIP M.D.

DOES 1 TO 100

PHILLIP J. CABASSO MD A MEDICAL CORPORATION

Minor

HAWKINS SALEN

Not Classified By Court

SAGGIO DAMARA

SAGGIO NOMINAL DEFENDANT MARISA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIGORYAN IVY BETH ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KJAR JAMES J. ESQ.

BRANDMAYER KENT T. ESQ.

REBACK MCANDREWS KJAR WARFORD &STOCKALPER

VELAZQUEZ DANIELLE CORKHILL

KJAR JAMES JORGEN ESQ.

MISSHORE BRYAN CHRISTOPHER ESQ.

Minor Attorney

GRIGORYAN IVY B.

 

Court Documents

Reply

10/5/2018: Reply

Reply

10/5/2018: Reply

Notice of Joinder

10/9/2018: Notice of Joinder

Motion for Summary Adjudication

1/8/2019: Motion for Summary Adjudication

Notice of Lodging

1/8/2019: Notice of Lodging

PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENDANTS PHILLIP CABASSO, M.D., AN INDIVIDUAL, AN

9/26/2018: PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENDANTS PHILLIP CABASSO, M.D., AN INDIVIDUAL, AN

DECLARATION OF IVY GRIGORYAN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENDANTS, PHILLIP CABASSO, M.D., AN

9/26/2018: DECLARATION OF IVY GRIGORYAN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENDANTS, PHILLIP CABASSO, M.D., AN

DECLARATION OF RYAN M. KLEIN, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENDANTS, PHILLIP CABASSO, M.D., AN

9/26/2018: DECLARATION OF RYAN M. KLEIN, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENDANTS, PHILLIP CABASSO, M.D., AN

PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENDANTS PHI

9/26/2018: PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF DEFENDANTS PHI

Minute Order

10/10/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION, OF DEFENDANTS PHILLIP CABASSO, M.D., AN INDIVIDUAL, AND PHILLIP J. CABASSO, M.D., A MEDICAL CORPORATION;

6/8/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION, OF DEFENDANTS PHILLIP CABASSO, M.D., AN INDIVIDUAL, AND PHILLIP J. CABASSO, M.D., A MEDICAL CORPORATION;

DEFENDANT RAJESH CHAWLA, M.D.'S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER TO DEFENDANT PHILLIP CABASSON, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

6/8/2018: DEFENDANT RAJESH CHAWLA, M.D.'S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER TO DEFENDANT PHILLIP CABASSON, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

7/26/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

1/30/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE - MEDICAL MALPRACTICE ; ETC

4/19/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE - MEDICAL MALPRACTICE ; ETC

Minute Order

7/19/2017: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

7/28/2017: DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

8/18/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Rajesh Chawla, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 05/13/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to compel a second session of plaintiff, Steven Hawkins' deposition) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to compel a second session of...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (to Compel a Second Session of Plaintiff, Steven Hawkin's Deposition; or in the alt, to Specially Set Def's Motion to Compel 2nd Session Depo; or in the alt, to Continue the Hearing for Plaintiffs' MSA, Trial & All Dates); Filed by Rajesh Chawla, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Motion to Compel (Second Session of Plaintiff, Steven Hawkins' Deposition); Filed by Rajesh Chawla, M.D. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Opposition (To Ex Parte Motion to Compel A Second Session of Plaintiff, Steven Hawkins', Deposition); Filed by Salen Hawkins (Plaintiff); Steven Hawkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • Declaration (In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Ex Parte Motion to Compel a Second Deposition of Plaintiff, Steven Hawkins); Filed by Salen Hawkins (Plaintiff); Steven Hawkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2017
  • Supplemental Declaration Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Salen Hawkins (Plaintiff); Steven Hawkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Salen Hawkins (Plaintiff); Steven Hawkins (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE - MEDICAL MALPRACTICE ; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC658421    Hearing Date: December 07, 2020    Dept: 29

Maldonado v. Mejia, et al.

Two Motions by Defendants, Carlos Mejia and Juan Mejia, for Order Compelling Plaintiff’s Verified Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One; and Demand for Inspection and Production of Documents, Set One; Request for Sanctions are GRANTED.

This action arises from a motor vehicle accident that occurred on 5/22/17. Plaintiff alleges two claims for negligence and negligence per se.

Defendants now move to compel Plaintiff to serve responses to written discovery. Plaintiff did not file an opposition. Defendants served Form Interrogatories and Demand for Inspection and Production of Documents on Plaintiff on 10/22/20. Motions, Exhibit A. Plaintiff did not serve verified responses. Defense counsel sent a meet and confer letter on 1/7/20 granting Plaintiff an extension of time to respond. Motions, Exhibit B.

Plaintiff’s counsel called defense counsel’s office to advise the responses would be served by 1/17/20. Plaintiff did not serve responses. Declaration of Declaration of Stephen Hsu, ¶¶ 5-6.

Plaintiff Magda Maldonado is ordered to serve verified responses to Form Interrogatories, Set One, and Demand for Inspection and Production of Documents, Set One, without objection within 20 days from notice of this order. Cal Code Civ Procedure § 2030.290(b); §2031.300(b). Untimely responses result in a waiver of objections. Cal Code Civil Procedure § 2030.290(b); §2031.300(b).

The Court imposes sanctions totaling $407.50 for both motions against Plaintiff Magda Maldonado and her counsel of record, Levon Kirakosian, jointly and severally, for failing to respond to an authorized method of discovery, which is discovery abuse. Cal Code Civil Procedure §2023.030.

Moving party is ordered to give notice, with proof of notice filed with the court.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRIGORYAN IVY B.