This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 05:37:43 (UTC).

STEVEN FREDERICK ABO VS DANNY SHIRI D D S

Case Summary

On 06/25/2018 STEVEN FREDERICK ABO filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DANNY SHIRI D D S. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1465

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABO STEVEN FREDERICK

Defendant

SHIRI DANNY D.D.S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROY RAJ D. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

BRADFORD THOMAS R. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: MEDICAL DENTAL MALPRACTICE DUE TO PROFESIONAL NEGLIGENCE

6/25/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: MEDICAL DENTAL MALPRACTICE DUE TO PROFESIONAL NEGLIGENCE

SUMMONS

6/25/2018: SUMMONS

Request for Judicial Notice

5/15/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Exhibit List

5/15/2019: Exhibit List

Declaration

5/15/2019: Declaration

Declaration

5/15/2019: Declaration

Motion for Summary Judgment

5/15/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

8/2/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

CIVIL DEPOSIT

7/26/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

DEFENDANT DANNY SHIRI, D.S.S.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/26/2018: DEFENDANT DANNY SHIRI, D.S.S.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT DANNY SHIRI, D.D.S.'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

7/26/2018: DEFENDANT DANNY SHIRI, D.D.S.'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

7/26/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY PURSUANT TO SECTION 9 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION STANDARDS

7/26/2018: DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY PURSUANT TO SECTION 9 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION STANDARDS

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of David Levine); Filed by Danny, D.D.S. Shiri (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by Danny, D.D.S. Shiri (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Filed by Danny, D.D.S. Shiri (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketExhibit List; Filed by Danny, D.D.S. Shiri (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Leslie Horwitz, Esq.); Filed by Danny, D.D.S. Shiri (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Steven Frederick Abo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Danny, D.D.S. Shiri (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT DANNY SHIRI, D.S.S.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT DANNY SHIRI, D.D.S.'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY PURSUANT TO SECTION 9 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION STANDARDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Danny, D.D.S. Shiri (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Steven Frederick Abo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: MEDICAL DENTAL MALPRACTICE DUE TO PROFESIONAL NEGLIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRADFORD THOMAS ROBERT