This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/14/2020 at 08:24:18 (UTC).

STEVEN BURCH VS RUBICON B HACIENDA LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/20/2018 STEVEN BURCH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RUBICON B HACIENDA LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4616

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BURCH STEVEN

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

MARRIOT INTERNATIONAL INC.

DOES 1 TO 50

RUBICON B HACIENDA LLC

SMART GRID CONSTRUCTION

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SMART GRID CONSTRUCTION

WORLD MECHANICAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

WRIGHT TIM D. ESQ.

WRIGHT TIMOTHY D. ESQ.

TERRY BAKER OREAR

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

DOLAN MICHAEL

MOROVATI CHRISTINA Y

SKANE THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Motion for Summary Judgment

9/25/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SEAN LAVELLE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT/CROSSCOMPLAINANT, RUBICON B. HACIENDA LLC'S, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF

9/25/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SEAN LAVELLE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT/CROSSCOMPLAINANT, RUBICON B. HACIENDA LLC'S, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/16/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/23/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY OR...) OF 04/23/2020

4/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY OR...) OF 04/23/2020

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/12/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Change of Firm Name

12/27/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Answer

11/1/2019: Answer

Cross-Complaint

10/7/2019: Cross-Complaint

Answer - ANSWER ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/7/2019: Answer - ANSWER ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Order - ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE, FSC DATE AND TO CONFORM ALL TRIAL-RELATED CUT-OFF AND MOTION DATES TO THE NEW TRIAL DATE

7/12/2019: Order - ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE, FSC DATE AND TO CONFORM ALL TRIAL-RELATED CUT-OFF AND MOTION DATES TO THE NEW TRIAL DATE

Order - ORDER OVERRULING DEMURRER

6/5/2019: Order - ORDER OVERRULING DEMURRER

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/24/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Cross-Complaint

4/23/2019: Cross-Complaint

Request for Judicial Notice

4/23/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF RUBICON B. HACIENDA LLC

5/17/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF RUBICON B. HACIENDA LLC

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

5/28/2019: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

6/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • Hearing02/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • Hearing12/22/2020 at 14:30 PM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • Hearing12/22/2020 at 14:30 PM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Hearing12/11/2020 at 13:30 PM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF SEAN LAVELLE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT/CROSSCOMPLAINANT, RUBICON B. HACIENDA LLC'S, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF); Filed by Marriot International, Inc. (Defendant); Rubicon B Hacienda LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Marriot International, Inc. (Defendant); Rubicon B Hacienda LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by Marriot International, Inc. (Defendant); Rubicon B Hacienda LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Filed by Marriot International, Inc. (Defendant); Rubicon B Hacienda LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference (to be heard with Summary Judgment Motion) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Steven Burch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketOpposition (to Demurrer of Rubicon B. Hacienda LLC); Filed by Steven Burch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Rubicon B Hacienda LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Rubicon B Hacienda LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Rubicon B Hacienda LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Rubicon B Hacienda LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Steven Burch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Steven Burch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC694616    Hearing Date: September 10, 2020    Dept: 31

This matter was mis-calendared and not worked up for today.  Please be prepared to discuss continued hearing dates.