This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 01:38:57 (UTC).

STEVE NGUYEN, ET AL. VS BE BUI NGUYEN

Case Summary

On 04/06/2017 STEVE NGUYEN filed an Other lawsuit against BE BUI NGUYEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB and CLIFFORD KLEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6740

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB

CLIFFORD KLEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

NGUYEN VU HOAN

NGUYEN TUYET

ROBINEAU ISABELLE

NGUYEN STEVE

NGUYEN STEVEN

NGUYEN VU HOAN AKA PAUL VU NUGYEN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

NGUYEN BE BUI

NGUYEN LONG HOANG

NGUYEN ADAM HOANG

NGUYEN ADAM

NGUYEN BETH THI AKA ELIZABETH NGUYEN AKA HANG N.T. NGUYEN AKA NGUYEN THI NGUYEN HANG

HANOI PLAZA LLC

SAIGON CENTER LLC

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HANEY STEVEN H. ESQ.

HANEY STEVEN H.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

TRAN HUNG BAN ESQ.

HESS-VERDON JILLYN SUE

TRAN HUNG BAN

VAN DYKE KEITH

LU TONY M

 

Court Documents

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

2/5/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

(1) PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BE BUI NGUYEN'S MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED IN L.A.S.C. CASE NO. BC656740;

2/7/2018: (1) PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BE BUI NGUYEN'S MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED IN L.A.S.C. CASE NO. BC656740;

PROOF OF SFRVICE OF FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

3/6/2018: PROOF OF SFRVICE OF FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF STEVEN H. HANEY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT IN CIVIL CASE NO. BC656740

5/8/2018: DECLARATION OF STEVEN H. HANEY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT IN CIVIL CASE NO. BC656740

(1) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT IN CIVIL CASE NO. BC656740;

5/8/2018: (1) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT IN CIVIL CASE NO. BC656740;

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/2/2018: OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OF DEFENDANTS ADAM HOANG NGUYEN AND LONG NGUYEN; DECLARATION OF SEAN M. CRONIN

7/12/2018: PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OF DEFENDANTS ADAM HOANG NGUYEN AND LONG NGUYEN; DECLARATION OF SEAN M. CRONIN

Minute Order

7/16/2018: Minute Order

Reply

10/22/2018: Reply

Minute Order

10/31/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

1/14/2019: Notice of Ruling

Motion to Compel

3/19/2019: Motion to Compel

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

4/15/2019: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

4/15/2019: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF TONY M. LU

12/29/2017: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF TONY M. LU

Minute Order

11/13/2017: Minute Order

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION BY SUMMONS

9/29/2017: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION BY SUMMONS

NOTICE THAT DEFENDANT?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT IS MOOT DUE TO PLAINTIFFS' FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/17/2017: NOTICE THAT DEFENDANT?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT IS MOOT DUE TO PLAINTIFFS' FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

113 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • Reply (Combined reply to opposition to Motion to Strike Objections in, and to Compel Further Reponses to Special Interrogatories, Set Three); Filed by Be Bui Nguyen (Defendant); Beth Thi Nguyen (Defendant); Hanoi Plaza, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Opposition (Vu and Steve Nguyen Opposition to Motion to Strike); Filed by Steven Nguyen (Plaintiff); Vu Hoan Nguyen (Plaintiff); Tuyet Nguyen (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • Opposition (Tuyet Nguyen Opposition to Motion to Strike); Filed by Steven Nguyen (Plaintiff); Vu Hoan Nguyen (Plaintiff); Tuyet Nguyen (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Opposition (Opposition to Notice of Ruling); Filed by Steven Nguyen (Plaintiff); Vu Hoan Nguyen (Plaintiff); Tuyet Nguyen (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Be Bui Nguyen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 9; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Special Interrogatories, Set Two)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 9; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Special Interrogatories)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Reply (Combined Reply to Joint Opposition to Motions to Compel Further Reponses to Special Interrogatories, Set Two); Filed by Be Bui Nguyen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 9; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set two)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) (Objections in, and to Compel Further Responses to, Special Interrogatories, Set Three); Filed by Be Bui Nguyen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2017
  • Motion ( STAY ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Notice-Related Cases (BP172375 ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Complaint ((4th)); Filed by Steven Nguyen (Plaintiff); Vu Hoan Nguyen (Plaintiff); Tuyet Nguyen (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Steve Nguyen (Plaintiff); Vu Hoan Nguyen (Plaintiff); Tuyet Nguyen (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Steve Nguyen (Plaintiff); Vu Hoan Nguyen (Plaintiff); Tuyet Nguyen (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Steven H. Haney, SBN 121980

Gregory L. Young SBN 226293 HANEY & YOUNG, LLP

1055 West Seventh Street, Suite 1950 Los Angeles, California 90017 Telephone: (213) 228-6500

Facsimile: (213) 228-6501

E-Mail: shaney(@haneyyoung.com

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

O&!LE@ |

Superior Court of Californ; ountv of 1 ne Anneleg a

NOV 30 2017

Sherrig, .....

S den Deputy

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, CENTRAL DISTRICT

STEVEN NGUYEN, an individual; VU HOAN NGUYEN aka PAUL VU NUGYEN, an individual; TUYET NGUYEN, an individual; and ISABELLE ROBINEAU, an individual, '

Plaintiffs VS.

) ) ) ) ) ) ) ) | BE BUI NGUYEN, an individual, BETH THI ) NGUYEN aka ELIZABETH NGUYEN aka ) HANG N. T. NGUYEN aka NGUYEN THI ) | NGUYEN HANG, an individual; HANOI ) CENTER, LLC, a California limited liability ) company; LONG HOANG NGUYEN, an ) individual; ADAM HOANG NGUYEN, an ) individual; and DOES 1 through 50, ) )

Defendants.

Case No. BC656740

[Hon. Clifford Klein, Dept. 9]

[Case No. BC656740 Related to Case No. BP172375, In the Matter of: the Nguyen Trust Dated July 21, 2015. Case No. BC656740 transferred from D-14 to D-9 on June 16, 2017]

SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR:

0 AN RNy

FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE; PHYSICAL ELDER ABUSE; BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; FRAUD - CONCEALMENT; MONEY OWED:;

UNJUST ENRICHMENT; MONEY HAD AND RECEIVED; APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER;

INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

TEMPORARY , RESTRAINING ORDER, PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION; DECLARATORY RELIEF; ACCOUNTING AND AUDIT;

CONSTRUCTIVE FRAUD JURY TRIAL DEMANDED