This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/18/2019 at 02:24:34 (UTC).

STEVE LIU VS XINCHENG CHU

Case Summary

On 03/07/2018 STEVE LIU filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against XINCHENG CHU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DUKES, ROBERT A. and PETER A. HERNANDEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0097

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DUKES, ROBERT A.

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LIU STEVE

LIU HWA LI

Defendants

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL

CHU XINCHENG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TAN KENNY KEAN LAW OFFICES OF

TAN KENNY KEAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: GRANT DEED;)

7/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: GRANT DEED;)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF HWA LI LIU IN SUPPORT OF QUIET TITLE JUDGMENT

7/10/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF HWA LI LIU IN SUPPORT OF QUIET TITLE JUDGMENT

Judgment

7/12/2019: Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT PROVE-UP;)

7/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT PROVE-UP;)

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

7/12/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/17/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/19/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference;)

1/24/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference;)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/7/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/7/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Application for Order to Post

3/29/2018: Application for Order to Post

Notice of Lis Pendens

3/14/2018: Notice of Lis Pendens

Application for Publication - Application for Order to Publish

3/20/2018: Application for Publication - Application for Order to Publish

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference;)

10/25/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference;)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice -

10/2/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice -

Other - - NON-SERVICE REPORT

7/20/2018: Other - - NON-SERVICE REPORT

Case Management Statement -

7/20/2018: Case Management Statement -

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketJudgment ([proposed] judgment); Filed by STEVE LIU (Plaintiff); HWA LI LIU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default/Default Prove-Up) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Docketat 4:25 PM in Department O, Peter A. Hernandez, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Grant Deed;) of 07/12/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default/Default Prove-Up;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Grant Deed;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketStatement of the Case; Filed by STEVE LIU (Plaintiff); HWA LI LIU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration Of Steve Liu In Support Of Quiet Title Judgment); Filed by STEVE LIU (Plaintiff); HWA LI LIU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketAppl.&Order for Public. of Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Pending Action; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by STEVE LIU (Plaintiff); HWA LI LIU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by STEVE LIU (Plaintiff); HWA LI LIU (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAN KENNY LAW OFFICE OF