This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/14/2023 at 12:02:30 (UTC).

STEVE GUTIERREZ VS FCA US, LLC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2022 STEVE GUTIERREZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US, LLC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1379

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUTIERREZ STEVE

Defendants

BROWNING DODGE CHRYSLER JEEP RAM

FCA US LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOLIN TIONNA GRACE

Defendant Attorney

HUGRET SPENCER

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/23/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/23/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/23/2022: Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/23/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

12/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/29/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

1/26/2023: Answer

Answer

2/1/2023: Answer

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2023
  • Hearing05/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 300 East Walnut St., Pasadena, CA 91101; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: BROWNING DODGE CHRYSLER JEEP RAM (Defendant); As to: Steve Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: FCA US, LLC. (Defendant); As to: Steve Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Steve Gutierrez (Plaintiff); As to: BROWNING DODGE CHRYSLER JEEP RAM (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/27/2022; Service Cost: 88.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Steve Gutierrez (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC. (Defendant); Service Date: 12/27/2022; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties changed from BROWNING DODGE CHRYSLER JEEP RAM (Defendant), FCA US, LLC. (Defendant) to FCA US, LLC. (Defendant), BROWNING DODGE CHRYSLER JEEP RAM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Steve Gutierrez (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC. (Defendant); BROWNING DODGE CHRYSLER JEEP RAM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Margaret L. Oldendorf in Department P Pasadena Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: As To Parties changed from FCA US, LLC. (Defendant), BROWNING DODGE CHRYSLER JEEP RAM (Defendant) to BROWNING DODGE CHRYSLER JEEP RAM (Defendant), FCA US, LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Summons on Complaint; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Steve Gutierrez (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC. (Defendant); BROWNING DODGE CHRYSLER JEEP RAM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Steve Gutierrez (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US, LLC. (Defendant); BROWNING DODGE CHRYSLER JEEP RAM (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less