This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 16:16:38 (UTC).

STEVE A. ZYNDA II AND LAURA J. WHITMYER, TRUSTEES OF THE ZYNDA/WHITMYER COMMUNITY PROPERTY TRUST VS CHARLES KWANG

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 STEVE A ZYNDA II AND LAURA J WHITMYER, TRUSTEES OF THE ZYNDA/WHITMYER COMMUNITY PROPERTY TRUST filed an Other lawsuit against CHARLES KWANG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0708

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEVE A. ZYNDA II AND LAURA J. WHITMYER TRUSTEES OF THE ZYNDA/WHITMYER COMMUNITY PROPERTY TRUST

Defendant

KWANG CHARLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS CHRIS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (CHARLES KWANG)

9/17/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (CHARLES KWANG)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

9/17/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

9/15/2021: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/15/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2022
  • Hearing09/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Charles Kwang)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Steve A. Zynda II and Laura J. Whitmyer, Trustees of The Zynda/Whitmyer Community Property Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Steve A. Zynda II and Laura J. Whitmyer, Trustees of The Zynda/Whitmyer Community Property Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by Steve A. Zynda II and Laura J. Whitmyer, Trustees of The Zynda/Whitmyer Community Property Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Steve A. Zynda II and Laura J. Whitmyer, Trustees of The Zynda/Whitmyer Community Property Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EVANS CHRIS