This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2022 at 01:55:52 (UTC).

STERLING, VICTORIA - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 STERLING, VICTORIA - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8161

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STERLING SANDRA

Claimant

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N.A.

Decedent

STERLING VICTORIA

Not Classified By Court

ELLIS STEPHEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STROH HERBERT ARTHUR

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

5/23/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/8/2022: Minute Order

Order - Final Distribution

3/30/2022: Order - Final Distribution

Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order - Ex Parte Petition and Order for Discharge

4/8/2022: Ex Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order - Ex Parte Petition and Order for Discharge

Account - Final or Waiver - 20211228 - Petition for Distribution (Sterling Estate)

12/28/2021: Account - Final or Waiver - 20211228 - Petition for Distribution (Sterling Estate)

Inventory & Appraisal - Final

12/7/2021: Inventory & Appraisal - Final

Miscellaneous Document - 20211007 - Satisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim

12/7/2021: Miscellaneous Document - 20211007 - Satisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim

Miscellaneous Document - 20211026 - Satisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim

12/7/2021: Miscellaneous Document - 20211026 - Satisfaction and Release of Creditor's Claim

Notice - Hearing - -First And Final Report Of Administrator, Petition For Distribution On Waiver Of Account For Allowance Of Statutory Attorneys' Fees For Ordinary Services, Reimbursement Of Costs Adv

12/29/2021: Notice - Hearing - -First And Final Report Of Administrator, Petition For Distribution On Waiver Of Account For Allowance Of Statutory Attorneys' Fees For Ordinary Services, Reimbursement Of Costs Adv

Notice - Administration to Creditors

6/15/2021: Notice - Administration to Creditors

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Capital One Bank (USA). Allowed:$3,866.76

9/1/2021: Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Capital One Bank (USA). Allowed:$3,866.76

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Capital One Bank (USA) - Allowed: $446.48

9/1/2021: Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Capital One Bank (USA) - Allowed: $446.48

Notice - Administration to Creditors - Notice to Franchise Tax Board

4/20/2021: Notice - Administration to Creditors - Notice to Franchise Tax Board

Bond

3/15/2021: Bond

Letters (Initial) - of Administration

3/15/2021: Letters (Initial) - of Administration

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

2/25/2021: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Declaration - Declaration in Support of Bond Waiver

2/11/2021: Declaration - Declaration in Support of Bond Waiver

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketEx Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order (Ex Parte Petition and Order for Discharge )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketOrder - Final Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketPetition Granted (Account - Final or Waiver filed on December 28, 2021 by Sandra Sterling. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (-First And Final Report Of Administrator, Petition For Distribution On Waiver Of Account For Allowance Of Statutory Attorneys' Fees For Ordinary Services, Reimbursement Of Costs Advanced, And For First And Final Distribution ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketAccount - Final or Waiver (20211228 - Petition for Distribution (Sterling Estate) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted (Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial) filed on October 1, 2020 by Sandra Sterling. )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration in Support of Bond Waiver ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STROH, HERBERT A.