This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2022 at 11:31:50 (UTC).

STEPHON DIAS VS OTHMAN CONTEH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 STEPHON DIAS filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OTHMAN CONTEH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0474

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIAS STEPHON

Defendants

CONTEH OTHMAN

EAN HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOSS DARRELL E.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/23/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/23/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

6/23/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

6/23/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/23/2022: Complaint

Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

6/23/2022: Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2024
  • Hearing06/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2023
  • Hearing12/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2023
  • Hearing12/07/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Stephon Dias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Stephon Dias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Stephon Dias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order (eFiling); Filed by Stephon Dias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOSS DARRELL E.