This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2019 at 17:36:21 (UTC).

STEPHEN WEBB VS INTER-CON SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2018 STEPHEN WEBB filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against INTER-CON SECURITY SYSTEMS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6955

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEBB STEPHEN

Defendants

INTER-CON SECURITY SYSTEMS INC.

VALENCIA CESAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDSZER RONALD ISAAC

Defendant Attorneys

JOHNSON-HARTWELL CHERYL

ZUCKER LAWRENCE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS...)

9/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS...) OF 09/20/2019

9/20/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS...) OF 09/20/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/19/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 08/19/2019

8/19/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 08/19/2019

Substitution of Attorney

7/1/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

7/1/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Answer

5/22/2019: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Mail

3/26/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/26/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Case Management Statement

4/2/2019: Case Management Statement

Complaint

11/30/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/30/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/30/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/4/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Order to Show Cause Re: (Sanctions, including dismissal, for Plaintiff's Failure to Appear at the CMC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions...) of 09/20/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 08/19/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Inter-Con Security Systems, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Cheryl Johnson-Hartwell (Attorney); Inter-Con Security Systems, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Inter-Con Security Systems, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Stephen Webb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Stephen Webb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Stephen Webb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Stephen Webb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Stephen Webb (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTER-CON SECURITY SYSTEMS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHNSON-HARTWELL CHERYL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAWRENCE S. ZUCKER II