Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/19/2021 at 18:13:27 (UTC).

STEPHEN VAN LAAR VS THE GREEN OLIVE RESTAURANT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 STEPHEN VAN LAAR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE GREEN OLIVE RESTAURANT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1604

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VAN LAAR STEPHEN

Defendants

THE GREEN OLIVE RESTAURANT

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

WAHBA JOSEPH

COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP INC.

PACIFIC CASUAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEYERS SCOTT ALAN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/13/2021: Request for Dismissal

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/23/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

2/5/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/14/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/14/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Stephen Van Laar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Stephen Van Laar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Stephen Van Laar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Stephen Van Laar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Stephen Van Laar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEYERS SCOTT ALAN