This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2021 at 22:00:19 (UTC).

STEPHEN THOMASON VS KAREN WALLEN

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 STEPHEN THOMASON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KAREN WALLEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3155

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMASON STEPHEN

Defendant

WALLEN KAREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAMBORELLI JOHN VINCENT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/22/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

7/6/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2024
  • Hearing06/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • Hearing12/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • Hearing12/06/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Stephen Thomason (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Stephen Thomason (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Stephen Thomason (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Stephen Thomason (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAMBORELLI JOHN V. ESQ.