This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/17/2023 at 14:22:00 (UTC).

STEPHEN MCPHERSON, ET AL. VS UMRO REALTY CORP., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 STEPHEN MCPHERSON, filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against UMRO REALTY CORP ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK H. EPSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0857

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK H. EPSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LACORTE JENNIFER

MCPHERSON STEPHEN

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

CORTESE DEDEE

HICKS CHRIS

UMRO REALTY CORP. DBA THE AGENCY

Cross Defendants

SRIVASTAVA GUARAV

UNITY RESOURCES GROUP A WYOMING CORRPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TORBETT JOHN

Defendant Attorney

ERLICH RINAT KLIER

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/2/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

2/22/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC)) OF 02/22/2023

2/22/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC)) OF 02/22/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

2/7/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC)) OF 02/07/2023

2/7/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC)) OF 02/07/2023

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/3/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)

1/10/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE) OF 01/10/2023

1/10/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE) OF 01/10/2023

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

8/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

8/10/2022: Cross-Complaint

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO ALLOW DEFENDANTS UMRO REALTY CORP, DBA THE AGENCY, DEEDEE CORTESE AND CHRIS HICKS TO FILE A CROSSCOMPLAINT AGAINST A THIRD PARTY; AND

6/21/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO ALLOW DEFENDANTS UMRO REALTY CORP, DBA THE AGENCY, DEEDEE CORTESE AND CHRIS HICKS TO FILE A CROSSCOMPLAINT AGAINST A THIRD PARTY; AND

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION (PROPOSED)

6/2/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION (PROPOSED)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/11/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Case Management Statement

10/25/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/3/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

10/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/13/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2024
  • Hearing02/13/2024 at 10:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2024
  • Hearing02/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Umro Realty Corp. (Defendant); Dawn Hemby Cortese aka Dedee Cortese Erroneously Sued As Dedee Cortese (Defendant); Chris Hicks (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for 02/22/2023 at 01:30 PM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department R Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 02/22/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of 02/22/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for 03/10/2023 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department R Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 03/24/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for 02/07/2023 at 01:30 PM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department R Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 02/22/2023 01:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of 02/07/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: Stephen McPherson (Plaintiff); Jennifer LaCorte (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Stephen McPherson (Plaintiff); Jennifer LaCorte (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine W. Mandel in Department P Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Stephen McPherson (Plaintiff); Jennifer LaCorte (Plaintiff); As to: Umro Realty Corp. (Defendant); Dedee Cortese (Defendant); Chris Hicks (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Stephen McPherson (Plaintiff); Jennifer LaCorte (Plaintiff); As to: Umro Realty Corp. (Defendant); Dedee Cortese (Defendant); Chris Hicks (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Stephen McPherson (Plaintiff); Jennifer LaCorte (Plaintiff); As to: Umro Realty Corp. (Defendant); Dedee Cortese (Defendant); Chris Hicks (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Stephen McPherson (Plaintiff); Jennifer LaCorte (Plaintiff); As to: Umro Realty Corp. (Defendant); Dedee Cortese (Defendant); Chris Hicks (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less