Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/30/2021 at 01:29:48 (UTC).

STEPHEN MARTINEZ VS FLOOR & DECOR, A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 STEPHEN MARTINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FLOOR DECOR, A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1026

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ STEPHEN

Defendants

FLOOR & DECOR OUTLETS - GL A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

FLOOR & DECOR OUTLETS OF AMERICA INC.

JOHN DOE AN INDIVIDUAL

FLOOR & DECOR A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCUS GERALD LEE

Defendant Attorney

PERSKY JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

12/24/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

12/24/2020: Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Request for Dismissal

2/16/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

2/22/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/25/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/25/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/25/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/2/2020: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

12/4/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/13/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/13/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/13/2019: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Floor & Decor Outlets of America, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Stephen Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement (of Entire Case); Filed by Stephen Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Floor & Decor Outlets of America, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Stephen Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Stephen Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Stephen Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Stephen Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Stephen Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Stephen Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Floor and Decor Outlets of America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARCUS GERALD LEE