This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/27/2022 at 20:50:47 (UTC).

STEPHEN FOX, ET AL. VS PROVIDENCE HEALTH & SERVICES, A WASHINGTON CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/02/2021 STEPHEN FOX filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against PROVIDENCE HEALTH SERVICES, A WASHINGTON CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4087

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FOX STEPHEN

FOX SUSAN

Defendants

ALI M.D. HIBA

AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE AMBULANCE SERVICE INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

APRIA HEALTHCARE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BISCARRA R.N VICTORIA PICHAY

BITTAR M.D. TAREK

GRUBER M.D. CHRISTOPHER ADAM DBA CHRISTOPHER ADAM GRUBER INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MELKONIAN M.D SUZY

NENSEY M.D CYRUS KARIM

NIKJOO M.D RABIN

PROVIDENCE HEALTH & SERVICES A WASHINGTON CORPORATION

PROVIDENCE HEALTH & SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM-SOUTHERN A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM-SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER-MISSION HILLS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PROVIDENCE HOME HEALTH INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SANI M.D. SASAN DBA CENTER FOR ALLERGY ASTHMA AND LUNG

2 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/2/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

12/14/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2024
  • Hearing12/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • Hearing06/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • Hearing05/18/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Stephen Fox (Plaintiff); Sheri Weitzman (Plaintiff); Susan Fox (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Stephen Fox (Plaintiff); Sheri Weitzman (Plaintiff); Susan Fox (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Stephen Fox (Plaintiff); Sheri Weitzman (Plaintiff); Susan Fox (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROVIDENCE HOME HEALTH INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where American Medical Response Ambulance Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where APRIA HEALTHCARE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant