This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/17/2021 at 06:39:36 (UTC).

STEPHEN AHN, ET AL. VS JONATHON JANFAZA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 STEPHEN AHN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JONATHON JANFAZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMANTHA JESSNER, TERRY GREEN, DAVID J. COWAN and DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6465

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SAMANTHA JESSNER

TERRY GREEN

DAVID J. COWAN

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AHN STEPHEN

AHN SUSIE

Defendants and Cross Defendants

WELLINGTON RESIDENTIAL COMMUNITY-HOME OWNER'S ASSOCIATION

JANFAZA JONATHON

AIRBNB INC. A CORPORATION

THE WELLINGTON RESIDENTIAL COMMUNITY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

JANFAZA JONATHON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

INUMERABLE NUMERIANO PAULINO

INUMERABLE N. JOE P.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

HELLESEN JON

KALTENBACH JOHN JOSEPH

DIAZ ROY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

10/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 09/20/2021

9/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 09/20/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

9/20/2021: Notice of Ruling

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/18/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/18/2021

5/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/18/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/19/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

4/5/2021: Answer

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/17/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF SUSIE AHN

3/11/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF SUSIE AHN

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF STEPHEN AHN

3/11/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF STEPHEN AHN

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE SELECTION OF A MEDIATOR) OF 03/12/2021

3/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE SELECTION OF A MEDIATOR) OF 03/12/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE SELECTION OF A MEDIATOR)

3/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE SELECTION OF A MEDIATOR)

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

2/8/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Proof of Service by Mail

1/28/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 01/28/2021

1/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 01/28/2021

Notice of Ruling

1/28/2021: Notice of Ruling

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • Hearing01/31/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Hearing01/18/2022 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Jury Trial ((fees paid)) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Jonathon Janfaza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of 09/20/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Jonathon Janfaza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jonathon Janfaza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Jonathon Janfaza (Cross-Complainant); Jonathon Janfaza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Stephen Ahn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Wellington Residential Community-Home Owner's Association (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Wellington Residential Community-Home Owner's Association (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Stephen Ahn (Plaintiff); Susie Ahn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Stephen Ahn (Plaintiff); Susie Ahn (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE WELLINGTON RESIDENTIAL COMMUNITY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AIRBNB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KALTENBACH JOHN J. ESQ.