This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/03/2022 at 04:02:09 (UTC).

STEPHANIE ZUNIGA, ET AL. VS MARINOS ALTOUNIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 STEPHANIE ZUNIGA filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARINOS ALTOUNIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7880

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VASQUEZ NESTOR

ZUNIGA STEPHANIE

Defendants

ALTOUNIAN MARINOS

TRATIZONIAN ELMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHY KENNETH RAY

Defendant Attorney

BEATON JULIE

Other Attorneys

FRANKLIN JOSHUA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/1/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

3/22/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

3/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Demand for Jury Trial

7/16/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

7/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

Answer

7/16/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2024
  • Hearing02/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • Hearing08/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • Hearing08/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Marinos Altounian (Defendant); Elmas Tratizonian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Association of Counsel for Plaintiff); Filed by Stephanie Zuniga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Marinos Altounian (Defendant); Elmas Tratizonian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Stephanie Zuniga (Plaintiff); Nestor Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Stephanie Zuniga (Plaintiff); Nestor Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Stephanie Zuniga (Plaintiff); Nestor Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANKLIN JOSHUA