This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2020 at 07:35:50 (UTC).

STEPHANIE PRINCE VS JOSE VALENZUELA JR,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 STEPHANIE PRINCE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSE VALENZUELA JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1431

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRINCE STEPHANIE

Defendants

VALENZUELA JR JOSE

NICK ALEXANDER IMPORTS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZI DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

6/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/18/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/8/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/8/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/8/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/8/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2023
  • Hearing06/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Hearing12/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Hearing11/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by STEPHANIE PRINCE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by STEPHANIE PRINCE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by STEPHANIE PRINCE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NICK ALEXANDER IMPORTS A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant