This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2020 at 15:46:52 (UTC).

STEPHANIE NOEMI RAMIREZ VS CARLOS DANIEL ORTIZ VEGA

Case Summary

On 03/23/2018 STEPHANIE NOEMI RAMIREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CARLOS DANIEL ORTIZ VEGA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9296

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RAMIREZ STEPHANIE NOEMI

Defendants and Respondents

VEGA CARLOS DANIEL ORTIZ

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FISCHER BARRY ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY/SUBMITTAL OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

1/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY/SUBMITTAL OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Default Judgment

1/17/2020: Default Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PROVE UP FOR COURT JUDGMENT

12/4/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PROVE UP FOR COURT JUDGMENT

Request for Dismissal

10/25/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY/SUBMITTAL OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

10/28/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY/SUBMITTAL OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/27/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE RAMIREZ IN SUPPORT OF PROVE UP FOR COURT JUDGMENT

9/27/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE RAMIREZ IN SUPPORT OF PROVE UP FOR COURT JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/6/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 09/06/2019

9/6/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 09/06/2019

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service

11/14/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/26/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/15/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Declaration re: Due Diligence

1/22/2019: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/22/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Mail

1/22/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/11/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

SUMMONS -

3/23/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: NEGLIGENCE

3/23/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: NEGLIGENCE

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry/Submittal of Default Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Stephanie Noemi Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Entry/Submittal of Default Judgment) of 01/17/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry/Submittal of Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (in support of prove up for court judgment); Filed by Stephanie Noemi Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry/Submittal of Default Judgment) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry/Submittal of Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Stephanie Noemi Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (OF STEPHANIE RAMIREZ IN SUPPORT OF PROVE UP FOR COURT JUDGMENT); Filed by Stephanie Noemi Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Stephanie Noemi Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Stephanie Noemi Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Stephanie Noemi Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Stephanie Noemi Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Stephanie Noemi Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Stephanie Noemi Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Stephanie Noemi Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Stephanie Noemi Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC699296    Hearing Date: October 24, 2019    Dept: 2

Ramirez v. Vega

The court has reviewed Plaintiff’s Request for Court Judgment and supporting papers. The court declines to enter judgment in Plaintiff’s favor. The request is unsupported by any documentary evidence establishing damages. Cal Rules of Court 3.1800. Plaintiff is required to submit evidence. Cal Code Civil Procedure § 585(b). Plaintiff is also ordered to submit a dismissal of all Defendants against whom judgment is not sought (Doe Defendants). Cal Rules of Court 3.1800.