This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2021 at 20:44:21 (UTC).

STEPHANIE MAGUR VS BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/16/2020 STEPHANIE MAGUR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2693

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAGUR STEPHANIE

Defendant

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VELARDE RAYMOND

Defendant Attorney

ARANI BEHROUZ

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/16/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/16/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/16/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (PUR...)

6/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (PUR...)

Proof of Personal Service

6/22/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (PUR...) OF 06/22/2020

6/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (PUR...) OF 06/22/2020

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/18/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

6/18/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

6/18/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/7/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDING

7/21/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDING

Notice - NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTIES

7/21/2020: Notice - NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTIES

Answer - ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

7/20/2020: Answer - ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

10/13/2020: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

1/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Stephanie Magur (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Stephanie Magur (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Stay of Proceeding); Filed by BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNotice (to Adverse Parties); Filed by BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketAnswer (and Demand for Jury Trial); Filed by BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • Docketat 10:28 AM in Department 19; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (Pur...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Stephanie Magur (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer (Pur...) of 06/22/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Stephanie Magur (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Stephanie Magur (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Stephanie Magur (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Stephanie Magur (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Stephanie Magur (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAREGHI ARANI BEHROUZ