This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2023 at 17:10:21 (UTC).

STEPHANIE KEIL VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/13/2022 STEPHANIE KEIL filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL C. KELLEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1033

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL C. KELLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KEIL STEPHANIE

Defendant

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMANO MARK

Defendant Attorney

INGOLD TREVOR J.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/13/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/13/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/13/2022: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

12/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/22/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/22/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

1/13/2023: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT

3/3/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/7/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

3/7/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/7/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/7/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/22/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

5/22/2023: Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketJury Trial (5-7 day estimate) scheduled for 02/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Stephanie Keil on 12/13/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Stephanie Keil as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Stephanie Keil (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketJury Trial (5-7 day estimate) scheduled for 02/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15 updated: Result Date to 03/22/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Stephanie Keil (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Stephanie Keil (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Stephanie Keil (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 12/14/2022; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Stephanie Keil (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Stephanie Keil (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Stephanie Keil (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael C. Kelley in Department A15 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less