This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 06:52:05 (UTC).

STEPHANIE JEANNETTE EVINS VS INGRID CORTEZ RIVERA

Case Summary

On 09/20/2017 STEPHANIE JEANNETTE EVINS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INGRID CORTEZ RIVERA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6729

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

EVINS STEPHANIE JEANETTE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 20

INGRID CORTEZ RIVERA

RIVERA INGRID CORTEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BASH STEVEN. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

3/6/2019: Minute Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/15/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order

5/24/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

5/24/2019: Unknown

SUMMONS

9/20/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

9/20/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 05/24/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by STEPHANIE JEANETTE EVINS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by STEPHANIE JEANETTE EVINS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC676729    Hearing Date: March 11, 2020    Dept: 29

Evins v. Cortez Rivera

Plaintiff’s Motion to Set Aside Dismissal of Plaintiff’s Complaint is GRANTED. The dismissal entered on 8/27/19 is vacated. The Court’s order dismissing the action on 8/6/19 is VACATED.

A motion for order to vacate dismissal must be filed within six months of the dismissal and show grounds of mistake, inadvertence, surprise, and excusable neglect. Cal Code Civil Procedure § 473(b).

The motion is timely made less than six months from the date of the dismissal. Plaintiff was not served at the proper address with the Court’s Order to Show Cause re Response or Entry of Default issued on 5/24/19.

If there is no prejudice, only slight evidence is needed. Doubts are resolved in favor of the party seeking relief. Mink v. Superior Court (1992) 2 Cal.App.4th 1338. Here, Plaintiff has sufficiently established that she is entitled to relief from dismissal.

Plaintiff’s counsel is ordered to make sure that the Court file reflects the correct address.

The court sets the following dates:

OSC re Response or Entry of Default: 5/11/2020, 8:30 a.m.

Final Status Conference: 8/6/2020 at 10:00 a.m.

Trial: 8/20/2020, 8:30 a.m.

OSC re Dismissal: 9/21/2020, 8:30 a.m.

Moving party to give notice.