This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2023 at 13:51:03 (UTC).

STEPHANIE BARAJAS, ET AL. VS CLAUDIA GUTIERREZ

Case Summary

On 01/17/2023 STEPHANIE BARAJAS, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CLAUDIA GUTIERREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0115

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BARAJAS AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR SELENE BARAJAS MIGUEL

BARAJAS MIGUEL

BARAJAS SAMANTHA

BARAJAS STEPHANIE

OROZCO MARGARET

Defendant

GUTIERREZ CLAUDIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DOUGLASS JONATHAN WARREN

FOWLER JASON PAUL

SHIHADY MARK GEORGE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT)

9/12/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT)

Notice of OSC - NOTICE OF OSC (NAME EXTENSION) REGARDING DISMISSAL

7/26/2023: Notice of OSC - NOTICE OF OSC (NAME EXTENSION) REGARDING DISMISSAL

Notice of Settlement

7/12/2023: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

7/12/2023: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Ruling

4/18/2023: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

4/18/2023: Notice of Ruling

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

4/11/2023: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

4/11/2023: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITIION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

4/11/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITIION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM AMENDED

3/27/2023: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM AMENDED

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ALLISON GRANDY

3/27/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ALLISON GRANDY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE OF CLAIM)

3/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE OF CLAIM)

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

2/3/2023: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/23/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/17/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

1/17/2023: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Complaint

1/17/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/17/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2023
  • Hearing11/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Deposit of Monies Into Blocked Account

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2023
  • Hearing11/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 11/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F47

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Proof of Deposit of Monies Into Blocked Account scheduled for 11/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F47

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F47 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 11/15/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of OSC (Name Extension) Regarding Dismissal; Filed by: STEPHANIE BARAJAS (Plaintiff); MIGUEL BARAJAS (Plaintiff); SAMANTHA BARAJAS (Plaintiff); MARGARET OROZCO (Plaintiff); SELENE BARAJAS, by and through her guardian ad litem, Miguel Barajas (Plaintiff); MIGUEL BARAJAS, as guardian ad litem for Selene Barajas (Plaintiff); As to: CLAUDIA GUTIERREZ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: STEPHANIE BARAJAS (Plaintiff); MIGUEL BARAJAS (Plaintiff); SAMANTHA BARAJAS (Plaintiff); MARGARET OROZCO (Plaintiff); SELENE BARAJAS, by and through her guardian ad litem, Miguel Barajas (Plaintiff); MIGUEL BARAJAS, as guardian ad litem for Selene Barajas (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F47

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F47

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: STEPHANIE BARAJAS (Plaintiff); MIGUEL BARAJAS (Plaintiff); SAMANTHA BARAJAS (Plaintiff); MARGARET OROZCO (Plaintiff); SELENE BARAJAS, by and through her guardian ad litem, Miguel Barajas (Plaintiff); MIGUEL BARAJAS, as guardian ad litem for Selene Barajas (Plaintiff); As to: CLAUDIA GUTIERREZ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STEPHANIE BARAJAS (Plaintiff); MIGUEL BARAJAS (Plaintiff); SAMANTHA BARAJAS (Plaintiff); MARGARET OROZCO (Plaintiff); SELENE BARAJAS, by and through her guardian ad litem, Miguel Barajas (Plaintiff); MIGUEL BARAJAS, as guardian ad litem for Selene Barajas (Plaintiff); As to: CLAUDIA GUTIERREZ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by: STEPHANIE BARAJAS (Plaintiff); MIGUEL BARAJAS (Plaintiff); SAMANTHA BARAJAS (Plaintiff); MARGARET OROZCO (Plaintiff); SELENE BARAJAS, by and through her guardian ad litem, Miguel Barajas (Plaintiff); MIGUEL BARAJAS, as guardian ad litem for Selene Barajas (Plaintiff); As to: CLAUDIA GUTIERREZ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Summons on Complaint; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Melvin D. Sandvig in Department F47 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Signed and Filed by: STEPHANIE BARAJAS (Plaintiff); MIGUEL BARAJAS (Plaintiff); SAMANTHA BARAJAS (Plaintiff); MARGARET OROZCO (Plaintiff); SELENE BARAJAS, by and through her guardian ad litem, Miguel Barajas (Plaintiff); MIGUEL BARAJAS, as guardian ad litem for Selene Barajas (Plaintiff); As to: CLAUDIA GUTIERREZ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Filed By: MIGUEL BARAJAS, as guardian ad litem for Selene Barajas (Plaintiff),MARGARET OROZCO (Plaintiff),SELENE BARAJAS, by and through her guardian ad litem, Miguel Barajas (Plaintiff),MIGUEL BARAJAS (Plaintiff),STEPHANIE BARAJAS (Plaintiff),SAMANTHA BARAJAS (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 01/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******0115 Hearing Date: April 11, 2023 Dept: F47

Dept. F47

Date: 4/11/23

Case #*******0115

MINOR’S COMPROMISE

Petition filed on 2/3/23.

MINOR: Selene Barajas

GAL: Miguel Angel Barajas (parent)

DEFENDANT: Claudia Gutierrez

SUMMARY OF ACTION: This action arises out of a motor vehicle accident wherein minor was a passenger in one of the vehicles along with her mother (driver), father, and grandmother. Minor suffered neck, low back, right leg pain; right hip bruise and anxiety.

SETTLEMENT: $6,210.00

Defendant Gutierrez’s insurance policy limits with State Farm were set forth in a declaration provided by her attorney (but not provided to the Court) which purportedly stated that the limits are as follows: $25,000.00 bodily injury limit per person/$50,000.00 bodily injury limit per accident. Plaintiff Stephanie Barajas had no underinsured provision on her automobile policy. The policy limits of defendant's policy were obtained and apportioned between the claimant/minor and each other plaintiff or claimant named in the petition. The apportionment was based on the severity of injuries sustained by each plaintiff.

ATTORNEY FEES: $1,552.50

MEDICAL EXPENSES: $62,109.52 (total); $43,748.83 (paid); $59,879.52 (reduction); $2,070.00 (to be paid from settlement)

EXPENSES: $589.84

AMOUNT TO BE PAID TO MINOR: $1,997.66 to be deposited in an insured account

RULING: The petition is granted/compromise is approved.



Case Number: *******0115 Hearing Date: March 1, 2023 Dept: F47

Dept. F47

Date: 3/1/23

Case #*******0115

MINOR’S COMPROMISE

Petition filed on 2/3/23.

MINOR: Selene Barajas

GAL: Miguel Angel Barajas (parent)

DEFENDANT: Claudia Gutierrez

SUMMARY OF ACTION: This action arises out of a motor vehicle accident wherein minor was a passenger in one of the vehicles along with her mother (driver), father, and grandmother. Minor suffered neck, low back, right leg pain; right hip bruise and anxiety.

SETTLEMENT: $6,210.00

Defendant Gutierrez’s insurance policy limits with State Farm were set forth in a declaration provided by her attorney (but not provided to the Court) which purportedly stated that the limits are as follows: $25,000.00 bodily injury limit per person/$50,000.00 bodily injury limit per accident. Plaintiff Stephanie Barajas had no underinsured provision on her automobile policy. The policy limits of defendant's policy were obtained and apportioned between the claimant/minor and each other plaintiff or claimant named in the petition. The apportionment was based on the severity of injuries sustained by each plaintiff.

ATTORNEY FEES: $1,552.50

MEDICAL EXPENSES: $62,109.52 (total); $43,748.83 (paid); $59,879.52 (reduction); $2,070.00 (to be paid from settlement)

EXPENSES: $589.84

AMOUNT TO BE PAID TO MINOR: $1,997.66 to be deposited in an insured account

RULING: The petition is denied without prejudice.

First, it is not clear that this petition is properly before this Court. This action was filed on 1/17/23 and never served on Defendant Claudia Gutierrez who has never appeared in this action. The instant Petition For Approval of Compromise of the Claim of Minor Selene Barajas was filed approximately two and a half weeks after the action was filed. As such, it appears that this action may have been filed for the sole purpose of having the compromise of the minor’s claim approved. If this is the case, Plaintiffs’ counsel has not followed the proper procedure.

If the claim of a minor is settled and there is no civil action pending, the settlement is to be approved by the probate court as provided in Probate Code sections 2505(b) and 3500. See LASC, Local Rule 4.115(a)(1).

Additionally, there is no way for the Court to confirm whether Defendant has any objection to the petition as she has not appeared in the action through counsel or otherwise. Minimally, a declaration from Defendant’s counsel must be filed to establish that Defendant is aware of the petition and has no objection thereto.

Further, the petition itself suffers from the following defects:

(1) Numbers 5-7 in the petition are not completed.

(2) Attachment 8 to the petition is merely notes regarding what appears to be a routine check-up that took place on 9/6/22 as there is no reference to the accident or the minor’s alleged injuries. The notes do say that the minor is cleared for sports and there are no restrictions for full activity.

(3) Number 10.b. regarding the terms of the settlement is not completed.

(4) Under the circumstances, the signature of the claimant/minor is not necessary under number 21.