This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/03/2022 at 17:41:45 (UTC).

STEPHANI COSTANZA VS YSABEL RESTAURANT

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 STEPHANI COSTANZA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against YSABEL RESTAURANT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3710

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COSTANZA STEPHANI

Defendant

YSABEL RESTAURANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURTON LINDSAY N.

Defendant Attorney

CARRON PAUL ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/13/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

10/25/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

10/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Answer

10/19/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

10/19/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Change of Firm Name

2/7/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2024
  • Hearing09/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • Hearing03/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • Hearing02/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Ysabel Restaurant (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ysabel Restaurant (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Ysabel Restaurant (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Stephani Costanza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Stephani Costanza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Stephani Costanza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARRON PAUL A. ESQ.