This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/11/2022 at 13:38:33 (UTC).

STEPHANE MARIE RODRIGUEZ VS VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 STEPHANE MARIE RODRIGUEZ filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0717

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ STEPHANE MARIE

Defendant

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLINE BRIAN

Defendant Attorney

OH ROBERT SAEHAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • Hearing01/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • Hearing12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 12/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Robert S. Oh in Support of Defendants Demurrer; Filed by: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Stephane Marie Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 09/20/2022; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Stephane Marie Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Stephane Marie Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Stephane Marie Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael C. Kelley in Department A15 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OH, ROBERT S.