This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/08/2020 at 00:17:08 (UTC).

STEPAN NAZARYAN ET AL VS LUIS LOPEZ MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 STEPAN NAZARYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LUIS LOPEZ MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7511

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BASRSEGYAN SATO

NAZARYAN STEPAN

Defendant

MARTINEZ LUIS LOPEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AKOPYAN ARSINE ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

WASSON DAVID BRADLEY ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

7/26/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL SUPPLEMENTAL SPL ROGS

11/15/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL SUPPLEMENTAL SPL ROGS

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL SUPPLEMENTAL FORM INTERROGATORIES

11/15/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL SUPPLEMENTAL FORM INTERROGATORIES

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FORM INTERROGATORIES

11/15/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FORM INTERROGATORIES

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS

11/15/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

11/15/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

11/15/2019: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

11/15/2019: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

11/15/2019: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF STEPAN NAZARYAN'S JOINT OPPOSITION TO LUIS LOPEZ MARTINEZ'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES AND SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC

12/9/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF STEPAN NAZARYAN'S JOINT OPPOSITION TO LUIS LOPEZ MARTINEZ'S MOTIONS TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES AND SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOC

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF SATO BARSEGYAN'S OPPOSITION TO LUIS LOPEZ MARTINEZ'S MOTION TO DEEM ADMISSIONS ADMITTED

12/9/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF SATO BARSEGYAN'S OPPOSITION TO LUIS LOPEZ MARTINEZ'S MOTION TO DEEM ADMISSIONS ADMITTED

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF SATO BARSEGYAN'S OPPOSITION TO LUIS LOPEZ MARTINEZ'S MOTION TO DEEM ADMISSIONS ADMITTED

12/9/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF SATO BARSEGYAN'S OPPOSITION TO LUIS LOPEZ MARTINEZ'S MOTION TO DEEM ADMISSIONS ADMITTED

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF SATO BARSEGYAN'S OPPOSITION TO LUIS LOPEZ MARTINEZ'S MOTION TO DEEM ADMISSIONS ADMITTED

12/9/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF SATO BARSEGYAN'S OPPOSITION TO LUIS LOPEZ MARTINEZ'S MOTION TO DEEM ADMISSIONS ADMITTED

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RONALD A. CHAVEZ IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION

12/16/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RONALD A. CHAVEZ IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION

Declaration - DECLARATION IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFF SATO BARESYAN'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION

12/16/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFF SATO BARESYAN'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RONALD CHAVEZ IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DEEM ADMITTED

12/16/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RONALD CHAVEZ IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DEEM ADMITTED

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF STEPHAN NAZARYAN'S "JOINT" OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO COMPEL RESPONSES

12/16/2019: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF STEPHAN NAZARYAN'S "JOINT" OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO COMPEL RESPONSES

Order - ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

12/18/2019: Order - ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by STEPAN NAZARYAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set-One --5842) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set-One --1271) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Responses to Supplemental Notice to produce Documents --4968) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set-One --8908) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Responses to Request to Produce Documents, Set-One --6845) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted (--0983) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set-One --0388) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LUIS LOPEZ MARTINEZ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by STEPAN NAZARYAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by STEPAN NAZARYAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by STEPAN NAZARYAN (Plaintiff); SATO BASRSEGYAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****7511    Hearing Date: December 20, 2019    Dept: 5

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

STEPAN NAZARYAN, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

LUIS LOPEZ MARTINEZ,

Defendant.

Case No.: ****7511

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 5 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT ONE:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE NORTH VALLEY DISTRICT, JUDGE MELVIN D. SANDVIG presiding in DEPT. F47 of the CHATSWORTH Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

DEFENDANT SHALL GIVE NOTICE.

DATED: December 18, 2019 ___________________________

Hon. Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WASSON, DAVID B.